Everest Lending Group, LLC
Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-21018 |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Everest Lending Group, LLC
275 Curry Hollow Rd Ste 230
Pittsburgh, PA 15236-4631 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
1000 Liberty Avenue Suite 1316
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Docket last updated: 20 minutes ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
crditcrd
none
Wed 05/01 9:51 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 24-21018 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16722156, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 04/30 12:17 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Keri P. Ebeck Filed by Creditor Duquesne Light Company (Ebeck, Keri) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 04/29 10:28 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jodi Hause Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the United States Trustee (Hause, Jodi) |
|
5 | 5
court
Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies
Mon 04/29 8:34 AM
Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies. Assigned Judge: DELLER.. Pursuant to Local Rule 1017-2, the United States Trustee is deemed to have filed a Motion To Dismiss this case, and that Motion will be deemed GRANTED, if any deadline set forth in the first docket entry or any of the following deadlines is not met. Incomplete Filings: LIST OF EQUITY SECURITY HOLDERS DUE 5/10/2024. SCHEDULE D DUE 5/10/2024. SCHEDULE G DUE 5/10/2024. SCHEDULE H DUE 5/10/2024. . Incomplete Filings due by 5/10/2024. (dpas) |
|
4 | 4
utility
Update Incomplete Filings Deadlines
Mon 04/29 8:32 AM
Deadlines Updated . List of Equity Security Holders due 5/10/2024. Schedule D due 5/10/2024. Schedule G due 5/10/2024. Schedule H due 5/10/2024. (dpas) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Corrective Entry
Mon 04/29 8:30 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: A MEMBER OF THE CLERK'S STAFF HAS TERMINATED THE DEADLINE FOR EMPLOYEE INCOME RECORD OR A STATEMENT THAT THERE IS NONE, AS IT IS REQUIRED ONLY FOR INDIVIDUAL BANKRUPTCY CASES. IN THE FUTURE, ONLY SET APPLICABLE DEADLINES. . (dpas) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29
Fri 04/26 3:18 PM
Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix Filed by Debtor Everest Lending Group, LLC (Thompson, Brian) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition Chapter 11
Fri 04/26 3:17 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Everest Lending Group, LLC Government Proof of Claim due by 10/22/2024. Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due 05/10/2024. Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/26/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 08/26/2024. Atty Disclosure Statement due 05/10/2024. Declaration of Schedules due 05/10/2024. Employee Income Record or a statement that there is no record due by 05/10/2024. Schedule A/B due 05/10/2024. Schedule E/F due 05/10/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/10/2024. Summary of schedules due 05/10/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 05/10/2024. (Thompson, Brian) |