California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:24-cv-03477
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2024
Terminated:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 3:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
Represented By
David Davidson
O'Hagan Meyer LLP
contact info
Alina Aleksandrovna Goncharova
O'Hagan Meyer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Idress Safi
Represented By
Terrence Irvin Swinson
Eric Bryan Seuth And Associates
contact info
Eric Bryan Seuthe
Law Offices Of Eric Bryan Seuthe And Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, December 12, 2024
20 20 order Dismissing Case Thu 12/12 10:46 AM
ORDER TO DISMISS by Judge George H Wu.Based upon Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal19 , filed on December 11, 2024, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety. (Case Terminated. Made JS-6.) (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
19 19 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 12/11 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Idress Safi. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Swinson, Terrence)
Related: [-]
18 18 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 12/11 10:01 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Senior District Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically at the ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT HEARING set for Thursday, December 12, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. The Court recommends counsel use a landline without the use of the speakerphone when appearing by telephone due to sound reception. If a cellular phone is used and it causes interference or interruptions, the Court will stop the proceeding and require counsel to appear in person. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
17 17 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 11/27 10:14 AM
TEXT-ENTRY ONLY - IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT HEARING previously scheduled for December 5, 2024 to December 12, 2024 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 10/31 11:37 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT by Judge George H Wu. On October 30, 2024, Plaintiff Idress Safi filed a Notice of Settlement15 . The Court vacates all currently set dates, with the expectation that a dismissal will be filed within 30 days. The Court sets an order to show re: settlement hearing for December 5, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. The hearing will be vacated provided a stipulation to dismiss is filed by noon on December 3, 2024. (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
15 15 notice Settlement Wed 10/30 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Idress Safi. (Swinson, Terrence)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
14 14 order Amended Minutes ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/25 10:29 AM
**AMENDED** MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - SCHEDULING ORDER held before Judge George H Wu. As per C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-15, the June 27, 2024 scheduling conference date is taken off calendar. The Court sets the following dates: The parties are free to amend pleadings under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 up to July 12, 2024. A post-mediation status conference is set for November 7, 2024 at 8:30 a.m., with mediation to be completed by November 3. The pre-trial conference will be held on April 17, 2025 at 8:30 a.m. Jury trial will begin on April 29, 2025 at 9:00 a.m. (See document for additional deadlines and details). RE: MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - SCHEDULING ORDER,13 . (aco)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/25 9:49 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge George H Wu. As per C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-15, the June 27, 2024 scheduling conference date is taken off calendar. The Court sets the following dates: A post-mediation status conference is set for November 7, 2024 at 8:30 a.m., with mediation to be completed by November 3. The pre-trial conference will be held on April 17, 2025 at 8:30 a.m. Jury trial will begin on April 29, 2025 at 9:00 a.m. (See document for additional deadlines and details). (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
12 12 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 06/24 3:04 PM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Senior District Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically for the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set on Thursday, June 27, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
11 11 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 06/20 4:24 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc... (Goncharova, Alina)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 05/20 1:20 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for June 27, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than June 20, 2024. See Local Rule 26-1. (aco)
Related: [-]
9 9 10 pgs order Order Mon 05/20 1:15 PM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
8 8 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Fri 05/10 3:18 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge George H Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-03477 GW(AGRx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 04/29 10:29 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 04/29 10:29 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 04/29 10:28 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/26 4:25 PM
Notice DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by DEFENDANT Walmart, Inc.. (Goncharova, Alina)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 04/26 4:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Walmart, Inc.. (Goncharova, Alina)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 04/26 4:21 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by dEFENDANT Walmart, Inc., identifying WALMART, INC.. (Goncharova, Alina)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/26 4:16 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT, case number 23CHCV03895 Receipt No: ACACDC-37367676 - Fee: $405, filed by DEFENDANT Walmart, Inc.. (Attorney Alina Aleksandrovna Goncharova added to party Walmart, Inc.(pty:mov))(Goncharova, Alina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 Exhibit ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT,
Att: 3 Exhibit DEMADND FO EELECTRONIC SERVICE,
Att: 4 Exhibit DEMAND FOR STATEMENT OF DAMAGES,
Att: 5 Exhibit NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE,
Att: 6 Exhibit STATATEMENT OF DAMAGES,
Att: 7 Exhibit NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF STATE COURT TO U.S. DISTRICT COURT
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 04/29 10:22 AM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Walmart, Inc., filed by Plaintiff Idress Safi.[FILED IN STATE COURT 12/22/2023 SUBMITTED AS EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 04/29 10:24 AM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc.[STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh)
Related: [-]