Wilder et al v. Honeywell Federal Manufacturing & Technologies, LLC
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Roseann A Ketchmark |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00305 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2024 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Western, 3:23-cv-00836 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 1:06 PM CDT |
Defendant
Honeywell Federal Manufacturing & Technologies, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Malachi Sanders
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cody Reed
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd Sorensen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Tuttle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Talon Wilder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Salmond
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristin Ashford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlie Childress
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Cumpton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Seth Hartman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gabe Maldonado
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Federal Manufacturing & Technologies, LLC
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mikel Roden
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dale Richardson
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Reid
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Pixler
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Pentrack
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sebastian Netotea
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Moes
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katie Meyer
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Meintel
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dwayne McDuffie
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keri Mason
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Andrew Mason
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sierra Sanchez
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Mannino
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Saunders
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tim Schow
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sierra Shepherd
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Percy Sledge
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Smerekanich
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willard Thomas
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcel Tira
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnathan Veenstra
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Villines
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Carlos Fernandez
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Akers
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brook Booth
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steve Booth
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luke Boysen
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Camron Brown
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karina Burchard
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Chee
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katherine Craven
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tina Cundiff
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Todd Debona
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Celeste Evans
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jesse Martinez
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Geis
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Geracci
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Godley
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Grant
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Haines
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Kelly
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Kezele
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brock Knowlton
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elvira Kolundzic
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Little
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Long
Terminated: 05/14/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Loudenbeck
Terminated: 05/15/2024
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, April 30, 2025 | ||
83 | 83
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 04/30 10:56 AM
ORDER granting81 Joint MOTION for extension of time to complete discovery and to extend discovery dispute motion deadline. Discovery dispute deadline due by 5/5/2025. Discovery due by 5/30/2025. Signed on April 30, 2025 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra) |
|
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
82 | 82
![]() SUGGESTIONS in support re81 Joint MOTION for extension of time to complete discovery and to extend discovery dispute motion deadline filed by Joseph D. Magrisso on behalf of Defendant Honeywell Federal Manufacturing & Technologies, LLC. (Magrisso, Joseph) |
|
81 | 81
![]() Joint MOTION for extension of time to complete discovery and to extend discovery dispute motion deadline filed by Joseph D. Magrisso on behalf of Honeywell Federal Manufacturing & Technologies, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/12/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Magrisso, Joseph) |