Fiedler v. Hyundai Motor America
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Leslie E Kobayashi |
Referred: | Rom Trader |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00190 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 15:1640 Truth in Lending |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 26, 2024 2:08 PM HST |
Defendant
Hyundai Motor America
|
|
Plaintiff
David Wescott Fiedler
solinno@yahoo.com 84-755 Ala Mahiku St. 73B
Waianae, HI 96792 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 08, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
1 - Terminate Motion Deadlines/Hearings (inc F&R) Link Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 05/08 3:18 PM
EO: COURT ORDER DEEMING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED AS A VETERAN WITHDRAWN. ...Plaintiff is reminded that he must serve the Amended Complaint and a summonson Defendant, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(nal) COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF) |
|
Tuesday, May 07, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 05/07 12:00 PM
AMENDED PLEADING against Hyundai Motor America - filed by David Wescott Fiedler.(eta) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits | ||
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 05/03 3:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Wescott Fiedler. Hyundai Motor America served on 4/30/2024. (eta) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/29 1:12 PM
Notice to Parties Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (eta) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Civil Waiver of Service Packet
Mon 04/29 1:11 PM
CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.(eta) |
|
Att: 1 AO 398 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, | ||
Att: 2 AO 399 Waiver of the Service of Summons | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/29 1:04 PM
Summons Issued as to Hyundai Motor America. (eta) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 04/29 1:03 PM
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number 3128 re1 Complaint (eta) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/26 12:50 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES RE: Corporate Disclosure Statements - Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (cgc) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Rule 16
Fri 04/26 12:44 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/24/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 4/26/2024. (cgc) COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Pro Se Consent to receive Notice of Electronic Filings
Fri 04/26 12:38 PM
Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Consent to Receive Documents and Notices of Electronic Filing by Email by Plaintiff David Wescott Fiedler. (cgc) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/26 12:34 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed as Veteran by Plaintiff David Wescott Fiedler. (cgc) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/26 12:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Hyundai Motor America; Jury Trial Requested - filed by David Wescott Fiedler.(cgc) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |