Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe Subscriber
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Micah WJ Smith |
Referred: | Kenneth J Mansfield |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00194 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 26, 2024 5:07 PM HST |
Defendant
John Doe Subscriber
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
misc
Court's Certificate of Service
Mon 04/29 5:51 PM
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of1 Complaint and2 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright has been served by email to the Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright Office at 508filings@loc.gov on April 29, 2024. (eta) |
||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/26 5:02 PM
Notice to Parties Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (eta) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Civil Waiver of Service Packet
Fri 04/26 5:01 PM
CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.(eta) |
|
Att: 1 AO 398 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, | ||
Att: 2 AO 399 Waiver of the Service of Summons | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Rule 16
Fri 04/26 4:59 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 6/24/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 4/26/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 04/26 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00194 MWJS-KJM on all further pleadings . (eta) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/26 3:57 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Kamau, Christian) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/26 3:56 PM
NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Kamau, Christian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/26 3:55 PM
COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against John Doe Subscriber ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-2994870.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Kamau, Christian) Modified on 4/26/2024 (eta) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |