New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Rochon
Case #: 1:24-cv-03165
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 22, 2024 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
District Attorney Alvin Bragg
Represented By
Madeleine Louise Guilmain
New York County District Attorney'S Offi
contact info
Defendant
Chandler Castro
Defendant
Attorney Stephen William Edwards
Defendant
Employee of The New York State District Attorney Office
Defendant
Detective Redmond Halpern
Defendant
Detective Gene Ruda
Defendant
The City of New York
Represented By
Zachary Kalmbach
New York City Law Department
contact info
Zoe Natalia Reszytniak
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
The State of New York
Plaintiff
Skiboky Stora
418 West 17th Street Apartment #19B
New York, NY 10011
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Gary Marcus
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Lisa Delpizzo
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Lysette Felciantongco
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Zoe Fleishaker
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Damon Ford
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Alfred Genao
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
John Hidalago
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Adrian Johnson
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Howard Kwok
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Caivin Li
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Edmond Li
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Brian Lukowsky
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Robert Delaney
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
William Martinez
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Jorge Pedroza
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Michael Rodriguez
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Max Rolffot
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Lilliana Shelanski
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Edward Smith
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
John Walters
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Philip Weisbord
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Johnny Wong
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Hannah Yu
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Steven Acevedo
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Officer John Doe
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Roger Ali
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Murad Alkadi
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Jesse Ankele
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Ashley Breton
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Cale B. Brown
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Desmond Brown
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Matthew Buonaspina
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Jacqueline Catalano
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Constantine Coritsidis
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Defendant
Joussett DeJesus
Terminated: 08/23/2024


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
38 38 misc Status Report Thu 04/10 4:42 PM
STATUS REPORT. Regarding Plaintiff's Underlying Criminal Proceeding Document filed by The City of New York. Related [+]
Related: [-] szytniak, Zoe
Friday, February 07, 2025
37 37 2 pgs misc Status Report Fri 02/07 4:48 PM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by The City of New York. Related [+]
Related: [-] szytniak, Zoe
Friday, December 13, 2024
36 36 misc Status Report Fri 12/13 4:27 PM
STATUS REPORT. Regarding Plaintiff's Underlying Criminal Matter Document filed by The City of New York. Related [+]
Related: [-] szytniak, Zoe
35 35 1 pgs order Order Fri 12/13 3:47 PM
ORDER On June 26, 2024, the Court ordered the City of New York to provide an update on the status of Plaintiffs criminal proceedings every 60 days. Dkt. 15. A status update was due December 11, 2024. To date, the Court has not received any such update. As a courtesy, the City of New York shall have until December 18, 2024, to file an update regarding the status of Plaintiffs criminal proceedings. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 12/13/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
34 34 misc Letter Thu 11/14 1:00 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Zoe Reszytniak dated 11/14/2024 re: Response to the Court's November 7, 2024 Order. Document filed by The City of New York. Related [+]
Related: [-] szytniak, Zoe
misc Mailing Receipt Thu 11/14 9:53 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 32. Mailed to: Skiboky Stora 559 Vermont Street Brooklyn, NY 11207. (anc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/13 12:59 PM
ORDER The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to update Plaintiff's mailing address to reflect the following: 559 Vermont Street, Brooklyn, New York, 11207. A copy of this Order shall be mailed to Plaintiff at the above-referenced address. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 11/13/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
33 33 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Thu 11/14 12:35 PM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Skiboky Stora consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Skiboky Stora. (jjc)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Letter Tue 11/12 5:55 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from ADA Madeleine Guilmain dated November 12, 2024 re: Status Update Re. Contacting Plaintiff. Document filed by Alvin Bragg..(Guilmain, Madeleine)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Fri 11/08 10:30 AM
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order Thu 11/07 4:09 PM
ORDER On October 21, 2024, the Court directed Plaintiff to update his address of record and instructed Defendants to undertake good-faith efforts to contact Plaintiff and to identify updated contact information for Plaintiff. Dkt. 29. To date, Plaintiff has not updated his mailing address. Plaintiff is instructed to update his mailing address by November 14, 2024. Defendants shall submit a status letter to the Court by November 14, 2024, providing an update on their efforts to contact Plaintiff and identify updated contact information for Plaintiff. Plaintiff is reminded that failure to comply with the Court's order may result in dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 11/7/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Tue 10/22 11:09 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 29. Mailed to: Skiboky Stora 418 West 17th Street Apartment #19B New York, NY 10011. (anc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order Mon 10/21 4:10 PM
ORDER On August 29, 2024, Plaintiff filed a notice of motion requesting to amend his complaint. Dkt. 22. On September 27, 2024, the Court granted Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend his complaint in the form proposed at Dkt. 17, and ordered that the stay in this matter be continued pending the resolution of the underlying criminal matter arising out of Plaintiff's March 27, 2024 arrest. Dkt. 26. The Court further ordered that Defendants shall have until sixty days after the stay is lifted to respond to the Amended Complaint. Dkt. 26. On September 30, 2024, the Court's order was returned to the Court as undeliverable. The Court subsequently attempted toupdate Plaintiffs mailing address to reflect his apartment number, as listed in Plaintiff'sComplaint. Dkt. 1. Notwithstanding the Court's efforts to update Plaintiffs mailing address, the Court's order was again returned to the Court as undeliverable on October 15, 2024. The Court directs Plaintiff to update his address of record. Should Plaintiff fail to comply with this order, the Court may dismiss the action for failure to prosecute. See Fields v. Beem, No. 13-CV-0005 (GTS/DEP), 2013 WL 3872834, at *2 (N.D.N.Y. July 24, 2013) ("A plaintiff is required to notify the Court when his address changes, and failure to do so is sufficient to justify dismissal of a plaintiff's complaint.") (collecting cases) Defendants are likewise instructed to undertake good-faith efforts to contact Plaintiff and to identify updated contact information for Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 10/21/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
misc Received Returned Mail Tue 10/15 4:34 PM
Received returned mail re:26 Order,. Mail was addressed to Skiboky Stora, at 418 West 17th Street, Apartment #19B, New York, NY 10011 and was returned for the following reason(s): insufficient address, unable to forward. (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
28 28 misc Status Report Fri 10/11 2:51 PM
STATUS REPORT. Regarding Plaintiff's Underlying Criminal Proceeding Document filed by The City of New York. Related [+]
Related: [-] szytniak, Zoe
Friday, October 04, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Fri 10/04 9:53 AM
RE-MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 13-15-21-23-24-26-27. Mailed to: Skiboky Stora 418 West 17th Street Apartment #19B New York, NY 10011. (vn) Modified on 10/4/2024 (vn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Thu 10/03 5:10 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 27. Mailed to: Skiboky Stora 418 West 17th Street New York, NY 10011. (vn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
27 27 order Order Wed 10/02 12:54 PM
ORDER. The Court of Clerk is respectfully requested to update Plaintiff's address to reflect the following: 418 West 17 Street, Apartment #19B, New York, New York 10011. The Court of Clerk is further directed to re-mail the Court's orders in this action to the above mailing address. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon) (Text Only Order) Copies of Notice of Electronic Filing To Be Mailed By Clerks Office. (aba)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
misc Mail Order by USPS Mon 09/30 9:51 AM
Mailed a copy of26 Order,, to Skiboky Stora 418 West 17th Street New York, NY 10011. (nb)
Related: [-]
misc Received Returned Mail Tue 10/01 2:54 PM
Received returned mail re: 24 Order,. Mail was addressed to Skiboky Stora at 418 West 17th Street, New York, NY 10011 and was returned for the following reason(s): insufficient address, unable to forward. (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order Fri 09/27 3:10 PM
ORDER Based on the represented Defendants' consent, Dkt. 25, the Court grants Plaintiffs motion for leave to amend his complaint in the form proposed at Dkt. 17. The stay in this matter shall be continued pending the resolution of the underlying criminal matter arising out of Plaintiff's March 27, 2024, arrest and the related warrant execution on April 18, 2024. See Dkt. 10. Defendants shall have until sixty days after the stay is lifted to respond to the Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to the Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 9/27/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
25 25 misc Letter Wed 09/25 3:24 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Zoe Reszytniak dated 9/25/2024 re: Defendants' Position Regarding Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Document filed by The City of New York. Related [+]
Related: [-] szytniak, Zoe
Monday, September 23, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Mon 09/23 9:13 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 24. Mailed to: Skiboky Stora 418 West 17th Street New York, NY 10011. (ak)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
24 24 order Order Fri 09/20 10:13 AM
ORDER. Per the Court's September 9, 2024 Order, Dkt. No. 23, by September 25, 2024, Defendants shall advise the Court whether they consent to Plaintiff filing his Amended Complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon) (Text Only Order) (aba)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Wed 09/11 2:13 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 23. Mailed to: Skiboky Stora 418 West 17th Street New York, NY 10011. (vba)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order Mon 09/09 4:32 PM
ORDER Per the Court's June 26, 2024 Order, a stay was granted in this action pending the conclusion of Plaintiff's underlying related criminal proceedings. ECF No. 15. In its August 23, 2024 Order, the Court rejected Plaintiff's Amended Complaint that was filed without leave of the Court or consent of Defendants. Dkt. 21 (citing to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2)). The Court advised that Plaintiff may seek the Courts permission to amend through a motion to amend, or if the Defendant consents. Dkt. 21. On August 29, 2024, Plaintiff filed a motion requesting leave to file an amended complaint. Dkt. 22. Defendants shall advise the Court whether they consent to Plaintiff filing his Amended Complaint if Defendants' deadline to respond to the Amended Complaint is extended until sixty days after the stay is lifted after the resolution of Plaintiff's underlying criminal proceeding. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 9/9/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/05 4:46 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION REQUESTING PERMISSION TO AMEND COMPLAINT. Document filed by Skiboky Stora. (jjc)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Mon 08/26 11:16 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 21. Mailed to: Skiboky Stora 418 West 17th Street New York, NY 10011. (vba)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
21 21 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 08/23 4:34 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:20 Letter filed by The City of New York. ENDORSEMENT The request is GRANTED. Plaintiff filed his original complaint on April 25, 2024. Dkt. 1. He served the complaint on Defendants on or before June 5, 2024. Dkts. 3-8. Consequently, the time for Plaintiff to amend his complaint as of right without court permission has expired. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1). Plaintiff's latest attempted amendment of his complaint on August 16, 2024 (Dkt. 17) was made without requesting leave from the Court or consent from Defendants. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). If Plaintiff wishes to file an amended complaint, he must submit a motion to amend his complaint or obtain consent from Defendants. This can be done now, if there is a potential statute of limitations issue, or after the case is unstayed. Until Plaintiff files such a motion or obtains consent from the parties, the Court will disregard the Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove the parties added to the case caption in light of the Amended Complaint. The case remains stayed until the resolution of Plaintiff's underlying criminal matter. SO ORDERED. Murad Alkadi (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Jesse Ankele (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Ashley Breton (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Cale B. Brown (Assistant District Attorney Analysts), Desmond Brown (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Matthew Buonaspina (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Jacqueline Catalano (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Constantine Coritsidis (Assistant District Attorney), Joussett DeJesus (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Robert Delaney (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Lisa Delpizzo (Assistant District Attorney), Lysette Felciantongco (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Zoe Fleishaker (Assistant District Attorney), Damon Ford (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Alfred Genao (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), John Hidalago (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Adrian Johnson (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Howard Kwok (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Caivin Li (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Edmond Li (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Brian Lukowsky (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Gary Marcus (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), William Martinez (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Officer John Doe (A fictitious name intended to be a Police Officer, Employee of the New York City Department Individually and as Police Officers of the New York City Police Department), Jorge Pedroza (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Michael Rodriguez (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Max Rolffot (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Lilliana Shelanski (Assistant District Attorney), Edward Smith (Assistant District Attorney), Skiboky Stora, John Walters (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Philip Weisbord (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Johnny Wong (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct), Hannah Yu (Assistant District Attorney), Steven Acevedo (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct) and Roger Ali (NYPD Police Officer - 7th Precinct) terminated. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 8/23/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
20 20 misc Letter Thu 08/22 4:35 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Zoe Reszytniak dated 8/22/2024 re: Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Document filed by The City of New York. Related [+]
Related: [-] szytniak, Zoe
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/22 4:28 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zoe Natalia Reszytniak on behalf of The City of New York. Related [+]
Related: [-] szytniak, Zoe
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
18 18 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 08/20 3:12 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Murad Alkadi, Adrian Johnson, Brian Lukowsky, John Hidalago, Howard Kwok, Steven Acevedo, John Walters, Jorge Pedroza, Jacqueline Catalano, Matthew Buonaspina, Johnny Wong, Max Rolffot, Gary Marcus, William Martinez, Roger Ali, Ashley Breton, Alfred Genao, Damon Ford, Joussett DeJesus, Robert Delaney, Desmond Brown, Michael Rodriguez, Caivin Li, Jesse Ankele, Lysette Felciantongco, Edmond Li, Philip Weisbord, Edward Smith, Cale B. Brown, Constantine Coritsidis, Zoe Fleishaker, Hannah Yu, Lisa Delpizzo and Lilliana Shelanski, re:17 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Skiboky Stora..(sac)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Tue 08/20 3:18 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Murad Alkadi, Adrian Johnson, Brian Lukowsky, John Hidalago, Howard Kwok, Steven Acevedo, John Walters, Jorge Pedroza, Jacqueline Catalano, Matthew Buonaspina, Johnny Wong, Max Rolffot, Gary Marcus, William Martinez, Roger Ali, Ashley Breton, Alfred Genao, Damon Ford, Joussett DeJesus, Robert Delaney, Desmond Brown, Michael Rodriguez, Caivin Li, Jesse Ankele, Lysette Felciantongco, Edmond Li, Philip Weisbord, Edward Smith, Cale B. Brown, Constantine Coritsidis, Zoe Fleishaker, Hannah Yu, Lisa Delpizzo and Lilliana Shelanski. (sac)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/20 3:09 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint, against Steven Acevedo, Roger Ali, Murad Alkadi, Jesse Ankele, Alvin Bragg, Ashley Breton, Cale B. Brown, Desmond Brown, Matthew Buonaspina, Chandler Castro, Jacqueline Catalano, Constantine Coritsidis, Joussett DeJesus, Robert Delaney, Lisa Delpizzo, Stephen William Edwards, Employee of The New York State District Attorney Office, Lysette Felciantongco, Zoe Fleishaker, Damon Ford, Alfred Genao, Redmond Halpern, John Hidalago, Adrian Johnson, Howard Kwok, Caivin Li, Edmond Li, Brian Lukowsky, Gary Marcus, William Martinez, Officer John Doe, Jorge Pedroza, Michael Rodriguez, Max Rolffot, Gene Ruda, Lilliana Shelanski, Edward Smith, The City of New York, The State of New York, John Walters, Philip Weisbord, Johnny Wong, Hannah Yu with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Skiboky Stora. Related document:1 Complaint. (sac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
16 16 misc Status Report Tue 08/13 3:37 PM
STATUS REPORT. Concerning Plaintiff's Underlying Criminal Matter Document filed by The City of New York. Related [+]
Related: [-] szytniak, Zoe
Thursday, June 27, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Thu 06/27 11:05 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 15. Mailed to: Skiboky Stora 418 West 17th Street New York, NY 10011. (nb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
15 15 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 06/26 4:26 PM
ORDER granting10 Letter Motion to Stay re:10 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Stay Pending the Resolution of Plaintiff's Underlying Criminal Matter addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Zachary Kalmbach dated 6/14/2024. For substantially the reasons as those stated in the City's letter-motion, the City's request for a stay is GRANTED. See Louis Vuitton Malletier S.A. v. LY USA, Inc., 676 F.3d 83, 99 (2d Cir. 2012) (noting that district courts balance the same six factors when considering whether to stay a civil matter pending related criminal proceedings). The case is stayed pending the conclusion of Plaintiff's underlying criminal proceedings. On August 13, 2024 and every 60 days thereafter, Defendant City of New York shall submit an update on the status of the criminal proceedings, until the conclusion of such proceedings. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 6/26/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
misc Mailing Receipt Wed 06/26 8:51 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 13. Mailed to: Skiboky Stora 418 West 17th Street New York, NY 10011. (rdz)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 06/24 12:47 PM
ORDER granting12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Madeleine Guilmain dated June 21, 2024. The request is GRANTED. Defendant DA shall respond to the Complaint by August 26, 2024. SO ORDERED. Alvin Bragg answer due 8/26/2024 (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 6/24/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 06/21 1:39 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Madeleine Guilmain dated June 21, 2024. Document filed by Alvin Bragg..(Guilmain, Madeleine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter to Plaintiff Requesting Consent,
Att: 2 Exhibit Plaintiff Letter Objecting to Extension,
Att: 3 Affidavit Affirmation of Service by Mail
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/21 1:32 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Madeleine Louise Guilmain on behalf of Alvin Bragg..(Guilmain, Madeleine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
14 14 misc Letter Tue 06/25 10:25 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Skiboky Stora dated 6/18/2024. Document filed by Skiboky Stora.(laq)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
10 10 motion Stay Fri 06/14 11:33 AM
FIRST LETTER MOTION to Stay Pending the Resolution of Plaintiff's Underlying Criminal Matter addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Zachary Kalmbach dated 6/14/2024. Document filed by The City of New York..(Kalmbach, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/14 11:28 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary Kalmbach on behalf of The City of New York..(Kalmbach, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
8 8 service Certificate of Service Other Thu 06/13 4:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Skiboky Stora. (laq)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Certificate of Service Other Thu 06/13 4:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Skiboky Stora. (laq)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Certificate of Service Other Thu 06/13 4:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Skiboky Stora. (laq)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Certificate of Service Other Thu 06/13 4:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Skiboky Stora. (laq)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Certificate of Service Other Thu 06/13 4:36 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Skiboky Stora. (laq)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Certificate of Service Other Thu 06/13 4:35 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Skiboky Stora. (laq)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/26 10:22 AM
COMPLAINT against Alvin Bragg, Chandler Castro, Stephen William Edwards, Employee of The New York State District Attorney Office, Redmond Halpern, Officer John Doe, Gene Ruda, The City of New York, The State of New York. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number 28758)Document filed by Skiboky Stora..(rdz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Receipt
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 04/26 10:22 AM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Fri 04/26 10:24 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alvin Bragg, Chandler Castro, Stephen William Edwards, Employee of The New York State District Attorney Office, Redmond Halpern, Officer John Doe, Gene Ruda, The City of New York, The State of New York..(rdz)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 04/26 1:40 PM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (rdz)
Related: [-]