Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Beth Bloom
Referred: Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein
Case #: 1:24-cv-21625
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2024
Terminated:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 1:45 PM EDT
Defendant
AAP Implants, Inc
Represented By
Sabrina R. Gallo
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Kaley Ree Jaslow
Greenberg Traurig, PA
contact info
Mediator
Stanford Blake
STANFORD BLAKE MEDIATION 2 GROVE ISLE DRIVE 203
MIAMI, FL 33133
Represented By
Stanford Blake
Stanford Blake Mediation
contact info
Plaintiff
Marlen Zamora
Represented By
David Thomas Valero
Marrero Serrano Farah Law LP
contact info
John William Annesser, II
Annesser Armenteros, PLLC
contact info
Carlos Alberto Ziegenhirt
Carlos A. Ziegenhirt, P.A.
contact info
Robert Andrew Bernstein
Annesser Armenteros PLLC
contact info

GPO Nov 20 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Recommending Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Counts I, III, VI, and VII of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint with Prejudice, ECF No. 47, be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Objections to R&R due by 12/4/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein on 11/20/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce)
GPO Dec 09 2024
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Granting In Part 47 Motion to Dismiss filed by AAP Implants, Inc, (Third Amended Complaint by December 19, 2024) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/6/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
66 66 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 03/12 9:50 AM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: re65 Joint Notice of Settlement. The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE this case for administrative purposes only. To the extent not otherwise disposed of, any scheduled hearings are CANCELED, all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT, and all deadlines are TERMINATED. Closing Case. (Without Prejudice) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/11/2025. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
65 65 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Tue 03/11 3:16 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Joint Notice of Settlement by AAP Implants, Inc (Juarez, Michelle)
Related: [-]