Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Allison D Burroughs
Case #: 1:21-cv-10274
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Apr 28, 2024 4:17 AM EDT
Defendant
University of Chester
Defendant
The Queen's University of Belfast
Defendant
The Royal Agricultural University
Defendant
The University of Birmingham
Defendant
The University of East Anglia
Defendant
The University of Essex
Defendant
The University of Huddersfield
Defendant
The University of Kent
Defendant
The University of Leeds
Defendant
The University of Leicester
Defendant
The University of Liverpool
Defendant
The University of Sheffield
Defendant
The University of Surrey
Defendant
University for the Creative Arts
Defendant
University of Brighton
Defendant
The Edward James Foundation
Defendant
University of Derby
Defendant
University of Dundee
Defendant
University of Durham
Defendant
University of Exeter
Defendant
University of Greenwich
Defendant
University of Hertfordshire
Defendant
University of Newcastle upon Tyne
Defendant
University of South Wales
Defendant
University of Southampton
Defendant
University of Stirling
Defendant
University of Strathclyde
Defendant
University of Winchester
Defendant
University of Worcester
Defendant
University of York
Defendant
London Metropolitan University
Defendant
Aberystwyth University
Defendant
Across The Pond - Study In Britain Limited
Defendant
BIMM Limited
Defendant
Bangor University
Defendant
John Borhaug
Defendant
British and Irish Modern Music Institute
Defendant
Brunel University London
Defendant
Cardiff University
Defendant
City, University of London
Defendant
Edinburgh Napier University
Defendant
Falmouth University
Defendant
Goldsmiths' College
Defendant
Kingston University Higher Education Corp.
Defendant
Hannah Liscombe
Defendant
Loughborough University
Defendant
Middlesex University
Defendant
Oxford Brookes University
Defendant
Queen Mary University of London
Defendant
Regent's University London Ltd.
Defendant
Roehampton University
Defendant
Royal Holloway and Bedford New College
Defendant
School of Oriental and African Studies
Defendant
Solent University Higher Education Corp.
Defendant
Study Across The Pond Study In Britain Limited
Defendant
Study Across The Pond, LLC
Defendant
Swansea University
Defendant
The Conde Nast Publications Ltd.
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Alexandra L. Brazier
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Brian M. LaMacchia
Us Attorney'S Office - Ma
contact info
Allison C. Carroll
Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Plaintiff
Hitrost LLC
Represented By
Erica B. Hitchings
Whistleblower Law Collaborative LLC
contact info

GPO Mar 19 2025
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. For the reasons set forth (herein), Defendants' motion, [ECF No. 52], is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part.SO ORDERED. (CAM)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
98 98 notice Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Fri 05/02 6:31 AM
NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at[LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/transcripts.htm] (DRK)
Related: [-]
97 97 misc Transcript Fri 05/02 6:31 AM
Transcript of Videoconference held on April 23, 2025, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite at mortellite@gmail.com. Redaction Request due 5/23/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/2/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2025. (DRK)
Related: [-]