Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael J Newman
Referred: Caroline H Gentry
Case #: 3:24-cv-00133
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2024
Terminated:Jul 09, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 7:47 AM EDT
Defendant
James Neyhouse
3929 Eagle Point Drive
Beavercreek, OH 45430
Represented By
David Michael Duwel
David M. Duwel & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
QSI, Inc.
107 Schuler Drive
Bardstown, KY 40004
Represented By
Ryan John Wilk
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Jaime S. Tuite
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Erin J. McLaughlin
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info

GPO Apr 29 2024
ORDER issued for the following: (1) REQUIRING PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL AND DEFENDANT TO MEET AND CONFER TO DETERMINE IF ANY RESOLUTION CAN BE REACHED CONCERNING THE MATTERS AT ISSUE IN THE PENDING MOTIONS FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; (2) REQUIRING PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL TO FILE A NOTICE INDICATING THE RESULTS OF THEIR INFORMAL CONFERENCE WITH PRO SE DEFENDANT; (3) AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL TO FILE THE NOTICE UNDER SEAL; AND (4) DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO IMMEDIATELY ADD TO THE DOCKET ATTORNEYS McGLAUGHLIN AND WILK AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 4/29/24. (sem)
GPO May 01 2024
ORDER: 1) Granting 6 QSI, Inc's ("QSI") Motion For A Temporary Restraining Order; (2) Granting 4 QSI's Motion For An Expedited Hearing On Its Motion For A Preliminary Injunction; (3) Granting 5 QSI's Motion For A Protective Order, And A Protective Order Will Separately Issue; And (4) Referring 3 QSI's Motion For Expedited Discovery To United States Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry For Expedited Hearing And Decision. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 5-1-24. (mcm)
GPO May 02 2024
ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 5/2/2024. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 3-1, # (2) Attachment 3-2) (srb) (emailed)
GPO Jul 09 2024
ORDER: (1) GRANTING THE PARTIES' MOTION TO ENTER A STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND FINAL ORDER (Doc. No. 27); (2) ISSUING THE STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND FINAL ORDER; (3) DENYING AS MOOT ALL REMAINING MOTIONS (Doc. Nos. 19, 21); AND (4) TERMINATINGTHIS CASE ON THE DOCKET. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 7/9/2024. (srb)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
30 30 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 07/09 11:53 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed on 7/9/2024. (srb)
Related: [-]
29 29 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 07/09 11:46 AM
ORDER: (1) GRANTING THE PARTIES' MOTION TO ENTER A STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND FINAL ORDER (Doc. No.27 ); (2) ISSUING THE STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND FINAL ORDER; (3) DENYING AS MOOT ALL REMAINING MOTIONS (Doc. Nos.19 ,21 ); AND (4) TERMINATINGTHIS CASE ON THE DOCKET. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 7/9/2024. (srb)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Tue 07/09 11:39 AM
NOTICE CANCELLING HEARING: The evidentiary hearing set for July 10, 2024 at 9:30 AM is hereby cancelled. (dkc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
27 27 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 06/26 3:04 PM
MOTION JOINT MOTION TO ENTER STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND FINAL ORDER by Plaintiff QSI, Inc.. (McLaughlin, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, June 20, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 06/20 5:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry: Telephone Conference via Zoom held on 6/20/2024. Ryan Wilk appeared for Plaintiff QSI. David Duwel appeared for Defendant. The parties indicated they are working on permanent injunction paperwork and there is no need for the evidentiary hearing set for 7/10 at 9:30 AM. The Court indicated it will hold the evidentiary hearing date until we see if something is worked out on the permanent injunction. Related [+] (dkc)
Related: [-] corded By: CourtSmart, record number: 6/20/2024
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Telephone Conference Tue 06/18 10:07 AM
NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for 6/20/2024 at 10:30 AM via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry. (dkc)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Telephone Conference Tue 06/18 9:41 AM
NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for 6/20/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry. To participate, please call 1-888-684-8852 and enter access code 1628120. (dkc) Modified on 6/18/2024 Clerical error see correct filing on next entry (pb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
24 24 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 06/13 3:29 PM
MOTION Request Status Conference by Defendant James Neyhouse. (Duwel, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/12 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Duwel for Defendant James Neyhouse (Duwel, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 06/06 12:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry: Telephone Conference held on 6/6/2024. The Court, counsel for Plaintiff (Erin McLaughlin and Ryan Wilkes) and the pro se Defendant Jim Neyhouse discussed alleged violations of the TRO. The Court directed Plaintiff to file a motion for contempt and the Court will set this matter for an evidentiary hearing. Plaintiff's motion for contempt due by June 14, 2024. Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition due by June 28, 2024. An evidentiary hearing on the motion for contempt will be held on July 10, 2024 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry. ( Evidentiary Hearing set for 7/10/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3 - Dayton before Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry.). (dkc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Telephone Conference Wed 06/05 9:34 AM
NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for 6/6/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry. To participate, call 1-888-684-8852 and enter access code 1628120. (dkc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
21 21 motion Default Judgment (Motion for) Tue 06/04 4:55 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against JAMES NEYHOUSE by Plaintiff QSI, Inc.. (McLaughlin, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, May 31, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order Fri 05/31 4:21 PM
ORDER: (1) REFERRING THIS CASE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROLINE H. GENTRY FOR CONSIDERATION AND DETERMINATION OF WHETHER PRO SE DEFENDANT JAMES NEYHOUSE HAS COMPLIED WITH THE PREVIOUSLY-ISSUED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (Doc. No.14 ) AND WHETHER HE SHOULD BE HELD IN CIVIL OR CRIMINAL CONTEMPT OR OTHERWISE SANCTIONED; AND (2) HOLDING IN ABEYANCE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN IN-COURT STATUS CONFERENCE (Doc. No.19 ) PENDING RESOLUTION OF THE ABOVE ISSUES. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 5/31/2024. (acw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/08 11:03 AM
MOTION Status Conference by Plaintiff QSI, Inc.. (McLaughlin, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/07 12:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant James Neyhouse. James Neyhouse served on 5/2/2024, answer due 5/23/2024. (McLaughlin, Erin)
Related: [-]
notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/07 9:01 AM
NOTICE re 17 Affidavit of Service. Counsel used incorrect docketing event to file service. Please re-file this document using the correct event of Summons Returned Executed; which is located under Civil Event-Initial Pleadings and Service-Service of Process. This entry will be restricted. (srb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
17 17 service Affidavit of Service Mon 05/06 8:08 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for ECF1, ECF3-11 served on Defendant James Neyhouse via his wife on 5 2-2024 filed by Plaintiff QSI, Inc.. (McLaughlin, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order Thu 05/02 1:08 PM
ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 5/2/2024. (srb) (emailed)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 3-1,
Att: 2 Attachment 3-2
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
15 15 order Protective Order Wed 05/01 6:44 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 5/1/24. (mcm)
Related: [-]
14 14 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Expedite Order on Motion for Hearing Order on Motion for Protective Order Order on Motion for TRO Wed 05/01 6:40 PM
ORDER: 1) Granting6 QSI, Inc's ("QSI") Motion For A Temporary Restraining Order; (2) Granting4 QSI's Motion For An Expedited Hearing On Its Motion For A Preliminary Injunction; (3) Granting5 QSI's Motion For A Protective Order, And A Protective Order Will Separately Issue; And (4) Referring3 QSI's Motion For Expedited Discovery To United States Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry For Expedited Hearing And Decision. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 5-1-24. (mcm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
13 13 misc Status Report Tue 04/30 8:53 PM
STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff QSI, Inc.. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulated TRO,
Att: 2 Exhibit April 30 Emails between R. Wilk and J. Neyhouse
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/30 9:04 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ryan John Wilk Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 4/30/2024. (srb)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 04/30 11:15 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael J. Newman. Status Teleconference held on 4/29/2024 at 3:00 P.M. Attorneys Jaime Tuite, Erin McLoughlin, and Ryan Wilk appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Defendant James Neyhouse appeared on behalf of himself. The parties discussed the TRO motion filed by Plaintiff earlier that day. The Court ordered the parties to meet and confer at their earliest convenience and to file an update with the Court afterward. The Court also advised Defendant of his right to have counsel represent him. The parties indicated they understood the Courts instructions and would provide an update shortly after they met and conferred. (Court Reporter: Julie Renee Hohenstein) (stk)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/30 11:19 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Designation as Trial Attorney - Attorney Erin J. McLaughlin is hereby admitted pro hac vice and is designated trial attorney for Plaintiff QSI Inc. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 4/30/2024. (tmm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order Mon 04/29 6:37 PM
ORDER issued for the following: (1) REQUIRING PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL AND DEFENDANT TO MEET AND CONFER TO DETERMINE IF ANY RESOLUTION CAN BE REACHED CONCERNING THE MATTERS AT ISSUE IN THE PENDING MOTIONS FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; (2) REQUIRING PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL TO FILE A NOTICE INDICATING THE RESULTS OF THEIR INFORMAL CONFERENCE WITH PRO SE DEFENDANT; (3) AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL TO FILE THE NOTICE UNDER SEAL; AND (4) DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO IMMEDIATELY ADD TO THE DOCKET ATTORNEYS McGLAUGHLIN AND WILK AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 4/29/24. (sem)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order Mon 04/29 1:33 PM
ORDER: (1) REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO MAKE EVERY EFFORT TO NOTIFY DEFENDANT OF THE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE TODAY, APRIL 29, 2024, AT 3:00 P.M.; (2) REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANT WITH THE COMPLAINT (Doc. No.1 ), THE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Doc. Nos.6 ,7 ), AND ALL OTHER PENDING MOTIONS (Doc. Nos.3 ,4 ,5 ); (3) REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN LOCAL COUNSEL TO REPRESENT IT IN THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 4/29/2024. (acw)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/29 12:29 PM
MOTION TRIAL ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF ERIN J. McLAUGHLIN, ESQ. MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE AND TRIAL ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF ERIN J. McLAUGHLIN, ESQ. by Plaintiff QSI, Inc.. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
9 9 service Summons Issued Mon 04/29 11:11 AM
Summons Issued as to James Neyhouse. (acw)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/29 10:26 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9941950) of Ryan J. Wilk by Plaintiff QSI, Inc.. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
7 7 misc Brief Mon 04/29 10:19 AM
BRIEF by Plaintiff QSI, Inc.. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 04/29 10:17 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Plaintiff QSI, Inc.. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 motion Protective Order Mon 04/29 10:15 AM
MOTION for Protective Order PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER OF COURT DIRECTING PRESERVATION OF DOCUMENTS, ELECTRONICALLY-STORED INFORMATION AND THINGS by Plaintiff QSI, Inc.. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 motion Expedite Hearing Mon 04/29 10:13 AM
MOTION to Expedite PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN EXPEDITED HEARING ( Responses due by 5/20/2024), MOTION for Hearing by Plaintiff QSI, Inc.. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
3 3 motion Expedite Discovery Mon 04/29 10:10 AM
MOTION to Expedite PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY , MOTION for Discovery ( Responses due by 5/20/2024) by Plaintiff QSI, Inc.. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit First Set of Interrogatories to Neyhouse (Exhibit A),
Att: 2 Exhibit First RFPDs for Mot to Exp Discovery (Exhibit B),
Att: 3 Exhibit Notice of Videotaped Depo of James Neyhouse (Exhibit C),
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 04/29 11:47 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/29/2024 at 3:00 PM by Teleconference before Judge Michael J. Newman. Counsel shall call +1 646 828 7666 and enter Meeting ID: 160 363 3497. To join as a participant, press #, enter Passcode: 098663, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (cem)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/26 11:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff QSI, Inc.. (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/26 11:21 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against James Neyhouse ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9941182), filed by QSI, Inc.. [ELECTION ISSUE(S) CITED] (Tuite, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Form