California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sandra R Klein
Case #: 2:24-bk-13254
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2024
Creditor Meeting:May 21, 2024
Terminated:Jun 03, 2024

Debtor
Pico Kosher Deli Enterprises, Inc.
8826 W Pico Blvd
Los Angeles, CA 90035-3302
Represented By
Craig G Margulies
Margulies Faith LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Heide Kurtz (TR)
2515 S. Western Avenue #11
San Pedro, CA 90732
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 04/27/2024 12:05 AM PDT
Friday, April 26, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 04/26 5:46 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:2:24-bk-13254] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56788480. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 04/26 5:43 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Pico Kosher Deli Enterprises, Inc. (Margulies, Craig)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Fri 04/26 7:06 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Kurtz (TR), Heide with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/21/2024 at 10:00 AM via TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]