New York Western District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00042
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 27, 2024 3:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Mohamed Khaled Sakr (1)
Represented By
Daniel J. Dubois
contact info
Jeffrey T. Bagley
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Nicholas Timothy Texido
Texido Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Russell T. Ippolito, Jr.
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Buffalo
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/11/2025 10:59 AM EST
Thursday, July 20, 2023
1 1 Sealed Document as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr. UNREDACTED COMPLAINT. (RAZ) Modified on 7/27/2023 (RAZ). [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
2 2 REDACTED COMPLAINT as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr (1). (RAZ) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
SCHEDULING NOTICE as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr. Initial Appearance set for 8/21/2023 01:00 PM in Alleghany Courtroom, 6th Floor East, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. (RAZ) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
4 4 Petition and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 7/26/2023.(RAZ) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
5 5 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr for 8/21/2023. (RAZ) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
RESCHEDULING NOTICE as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr. Due to a delay in defendant's transport, Initial Appearance set for 8/21/2023 at 1:00 PM is RESCHEDULED to 8/23/2023 at 1:00 PM in Alleghany Courtroom, 6th Floor East, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. (RAZ) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Appearances: AUSA Russell T. Ippolito, Jr. on behalf of government; AFPD Jeffrey T. Bagley w/defendant Mohamed Khaled Sakr; USPO Brian M. Mamizuka. Initial Appearance as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr held on 8/23/2023. Government advised defendant of charges contained in the Criminal Complaint and the possible penalties. Court advised defendant of his rights, including the right to counsel. AFPD Bagley agreed to represent defendant at this proceeding as defendant may retain Steven C. Boozang, Esq. Government moved for detention. Detention Hearing set for 9/1/2023 11:00 AM in Alleghany Courtroom, 6th Floor East, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Michael J. Roemer at which time the issue of a preliminary hearing and the setting of a Rule 48(b) date will be addressed. Time excluded through 9/1/2023 for the purpose of the Speedy Trial Act as stated on the record. The Court advised the government of their Brady obligations. Defendant was remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal Service. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(RAZ) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
7 7 RULE 5(f) ORDER as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 8/23/2023.(RAZ) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
8 8 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Returned Executed as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr on 8/23/2023. (RAZ) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Appearances: AUSA Russell T. Ippolito, Jr. on behalf of government; AFPD Jeffrey T. Bagley w/defendant Mohamed Khaled Sakr; USPO Melissa S. Linton. Detention Hearing as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr not held on 9/1/2023. Defense counsel requested additional time as defendant may still retain counsel. Detention Hearing set for 9/6/2023 11:30 AM in Alleghany Courtroom, 6th Floor East, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Michael J. Roemer at which time the issue of a preliminary hearing and the setting of a Rule 48(b) date will be addressed. Time excluded through 9/6/2023 for the purpose of the Speedy Trial Act as stated on the record. Defendant remained detained. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(RAZ) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Appearances: AUSA Russell T. Ippolito, Jr. on behalf of government; AFPD Jeffrey T. Bagley w/defendant Mohamed Khaled Sakr; USPO Melissa S. Linton. Detention Hearing as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr held on 9/6/2023. Parties proceeded by proffer. Probation Office recommended detention. The Court found flight risk by a preponderance of evidence and ordered the defendant detained. Defendant waived a preliminary hearing. Status Conference (Rule 48(b)) set for 11/14/2023 11:30 AM in Alleghany Courtroom, 6th Floor East, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Time excluded through 11/14/2023 for the purpose of the Speedy Trial Act as stated on the record. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(RAZ) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 9/6/2023.(RAZ) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
12 12 PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 10/13/2023.(RAZ) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
13 13 MOTION to Adjourn 48(b) status conference by Mohamed Khaled Sakr. (Bagley, Jeffrey) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
14 14 TEXT ORDER granting13 Motion to Adjourn Rule 48(b) Dismissal Date as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr (1). Status Conference (Rule 48(b)) set for 11/14/2023 at 11:30 AM is RESCHEDULED to 12/19/2023 at 11:00 AM in Alleghany Courtroom, 6th Floor East, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Time excluded through 12/19/2023 for purposes of the Speedy Trial Act, pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Sections 3161(h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B)(iv), and Rule 5.1 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 11/3/2023.(RAZ) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
15 15 Notice of Appearance Attorney: Daniel J DuBois. by Mohamed Khaled Sakr. (Dubois, Daniel) Modified on 1/9/2024 (RAZ). [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
16 16 MOTION to Adjourn 48b by Mohamed Khaled Sakr. (Dubois, Daniel) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 10, 2023
17 17 TEXT ORDER as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr. AFPD Jeffrey T. Bagley terminated in case as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr as defendant has retained Daniel J. DuBois, Esq. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 12/10/2023.(RAZ) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
18 18 TEXT ORDER granting16 Motion to Adjourn Rule 48(b) Dismissal Date as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr (1). Status Conference (Rule 48(b)) set for 12/19/2023 at 11:00 AM is RESCHEDULED to 2/5/2024 at 11:00 AM in Alleghany Courtroom, 6th Floor East, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Time excluded through 2/5/2024 for purposes of the Speedy Trial Act, pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Sections 3161(h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B)(iv), and Rule 5.1 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 12/10/2023.(RAZ) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
19 19 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nicholas Timothy Texido appearing for Mohamed Khaled Sakr (Texido, Nicholas) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
20 20 MOTION to Adjourn by Mohamed Khaled Sakr. (Dubois, Daniel) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
21 21 TEXT ORDER granting20 Motion to Adjourn Rule 48(b) Dismissal Date as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr (1). Status Conference (Rule 48(b)) set for 2/5/2024 at 11:00 AM is RESCHEDULED to 3/26/2024 at 1:00 PM in Alleghany Courtroom, 6th Floor East, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Time excluded through 3/26/2024 for purposes of the Speedy Trial Act, pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Sections 3161(h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B)(iv), and Rule 5.1 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/9/2024.(RAZ) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
22 22 MOTION to Adjourn 48b with Co-Counsel Nicholas Texido by Mohamed Khaled Sakr. (Dubois, Daniel) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
23 23 TEXT ORDER granting22 Motion to Adjourn Rule 48(b) Dismissal Date as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr (1). Status Conference (Rule 48(b)) set for 3/26/2024 at 1:00 PM is RESCHEDULED to 5/17/2024 at 11:30 AM in Alleghany Courtroom, 6th Floor East, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Time excluded through 5/17/2024 for purposes of the Speedy Trial Act, Rule 5.1 of the Fed. R. Crim. P. pursuant to Title 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B)(iv). SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 3/7/2024.(RAZ) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
SCHEDULING NOTICE as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr. Change of Plea Hearing set for 4/24/2024 02:00 PM in Allegany Courtroom, 6th Floor East, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. (RAZ) [1:23-mj-05137-MJR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
24 24 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO TAKE GUILTY PLEA as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 3/25/24.(SG)
Related: [-]
25 25 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Mohamed Khaled Sakr (SG)
Related: [-]
26 26 INFORMATION as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr (1) count(s) 1. (SG)
Related: [-]
27 27 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE to take guilty plea. (SG)
Related: [-]
28 28 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr (SG)
Related: [-]
29 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Appearances: AUSA Russell T. Ippolito, Jr. on behalf of government; Daniel J. Dubois, Esq. and Nicholas T. Texido, Esq. w/defendant Mohamed Khaled Sakr. Change of Plea Hearing as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr held on 4/24/2024. Court accepted and approved Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge for entry of guilty plea. Court conducted colloquy with defendant. Court found knowing and voluntary decision to plea. Defendant entered plea of guilty to Count 1 of the Information. Court made oral recommendation that the plea be accepted by the Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Written Report and Recommendation to follow. Sentencing submission schedule and date shall be set by Judge Vilardo's Chambers. PROBATION NOTIFIED OF PLEA. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(RAZ)
Related: [-]
30 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Plea of Guilty as to Mohamed Khaled Sakr. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 4/24/2024.(RAZ) (Main Document 30 replaced on 4/30/2024) (RAZ).
Related: [-]