California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-01632
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2024
Terminated:Apr 25, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 27, 2024 12:29 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Meta Platforms Inc. 1601 Willow Road, Menlo Park, CA 94025 RE: https://www.instagram.com/kill96omez/ (1)
Terminated: 04/25/2024


Docket last updated: 04/27/2024 1:38 AM PDT
Thursday, April 25, 2024
1 1 Application and Affidavit for Search and Seizure Warrant entered as to Meta Platforms Inc. 1601 Willow Road, Menlo Park, CA 94025 RE: https://www.instagram.com/kill96omez/. (fjp)
Related: [-]