Kentucky Eastern District Court
Case #: 7:24-cr-00005
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 27, 2024 3:16 AM EDT
Defendant
Gabriel Howell (1)
Represented By
Michael B. Fox
Fox Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
W. Pearce Nesbitt, AUSA
U.S. Attorney'S Office - London
contact info

GPO Feb 21 2025
ORDER as to Gabriel Howell: Court ADOPTS the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation (DE 50) and ACCEPTS dfts plea of guilty. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/21/2025. (TDA) cc: COR,USM,USP

Docket last updated: 04/27/2024 4:13 AM EDT
Monday, April 08, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Gabriel Howell (1). (TDA) [7:24-mj-00001-EBA]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Complaint
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
CJA Case Assignment by Clerk: APPOINTED CJA Attorney Michael B. Fox for Gabriel Howell. cc: COR, USP, USM (TDA) [7:24-mj-00001-EBA]
Related: [-]
Conflict Check run. (TDA) [7:24-mj-00001-EBA]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER as to Gabriel Howell: Dft now in custody, IT IS ORDERED that Dft appear for initial appearance proceedings before undersigned on Thursday, April 11, 2024, at 11:30 A.M. in US Courthouse in Ashland, KY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 4/9/2024. (TDA) cc: COR,USM,USP & AshCD [7:24-mj-00001-EBA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
ORAL MOTION as to Gabriel Howell by USA (RCB) [7:24-mj-00001-EBA]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Gabriel Howell (RCB) [7:24-mj-00001-EBA]
Related: [-]
5 5 ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed on 4/11/2024 in case as to Gabriel Howell. (TDA) [7:24-mj-00001-EBA]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Gabriel Howell. (TDA) [7:24-mj-00001-EBA]
Related: [-]
7 7 MINUTE ENTRY FOR INITIAL APPEARANCE AND PRELIMINARY HEARING as to Gabriel Howell held on 4/11/2024 before Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins: Court reviewed financial affidavit and finds dft does qualify for court appointment counsel. Attorney Michael B. Fox was appointed to represent dft under CJA. Court advised Dft of his right to a Preliminary hearing and Detention Hearing. Upon consultation with counsel, Dft advised he wished to proceed with preliminary hearing. Court conducted a Preliminary Hearing and found probable cause support alleged offense. United States advised Court it is seeking Detention. Court finds United States Motion for Detention is properly made. Dft asked for a hearing at a later date, reserving right to move for a hearing. Dft remanded to custody. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins. (Tape #KYED-ASH__7-24-mj-1_20240411_112754) (RCB) cc: COR,USM,USP [7:24-mj-00001-EBA]
Related: [-]
8 8 EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST as to Gabriel Howell re Preliminary Hearing held 4/11/2024 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins. (RCB) [7:24-mj-00001-EBA]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
CJA Appointment of Attorney for Gabriel Howell. The Clerk ENTERED the representation and appointment in the eVoucher system for Michael B. Fox. (RCB) [7:24-mj-00001-EBA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
Conflict Check run. (TDA)
Related: [-]
*** MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS OF Judge Atkins to review re12 MOTION for Arraignment by USA filed as to Gabriel Howell. (TDA)
Related: [-]
9 9 INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Gabriel Howell, Count 1. (TDA)
Related: [-]
10 10 SEALED UNREDACTED Indictment re9 Indictment by USA as to Gabriel Howell. (TDA)
Related: [-]
12 12 MOTION for Arraignment by USA as to Gabriel Howell. Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (TDA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order