New York Southern District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Vyskocil
Case #: 7:24-cv-03221
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 6:48 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Guangzhoushikaermansixinxikejiyouxiangongsi
Represented By
Joseph Anthony Farco
Norris Mclaughlin, PA
contact info
Counter Defendant
Jiaxiang Ye
Represented By
Lance Liu
Lance Liu
contact info
Defendant
Guangzhoushikaermansixinxikejiyouxiangongsi
Represented By
Joseph Anthony Farco
Norris Mclaughlin, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Jiaxiang Ye
Represented By
Lance Liu
Lance Liu
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, July 15, 2024
17 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Guangzhoushikaermansixinxikejiyouxiangongsi waiver sent on 5/24/2024, answer due 8/22/2024. Document filed by Jiaxiang Ye..(Liu, Lance)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 16, 2024
16 16 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Reply . Document filed by Jiaxiang Ye..(Liu, Lance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
15 15 REPLY re:13 LETTER MOTION for Conference pursuant to Individual Practice Rule 4A(i) addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Joseph Farco dated May 24, 2024. . Document filed by Guangzhoushikaermansixinxikejiyouxiangongsi..(Farco, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit D,
Att: 2 Exhibit E,
Att: 3 Exhibit F,
Att: 4 Exhibit G
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
14 14 RESPONSE re:13 LETTER MOTION for Conference pursuant to Individual Practice Rule 4A(i) addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Joseph Farco dated May 24, 2024. . Document filed by Jiaxiang Ye..(Liu, Lance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2
Friday, May 24, 2024
13 13 LETTER MOTION for Conference pursuant to Individual Practice Rule 4A(i) addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Joseph Farco dated May 24, 2024. Document filed by Guangzhoushikaermansixinxikejiyouxiangongsi..(Farco, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (CN20213019004),
Att: 2 Exhibit B (TWD219907S),
Att: 3 Exhibit C (TWM62801U)
Saturday, May 18, 2024
12 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Anthony Farco on behalf of Guangzhoushikaermansixinxikejiyouxiangongsi..(Farco, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
11 11 1 pgs AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (vf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
10 10 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Liu, Lance)
Related: [-]
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PATENT FORM. Notice to Attorney Lance Liu to RE-FILE Document No. 8 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): incorrect date filed.. Re-file the document using the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 120 Patent/Trademark PDF form. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
9 9 2 pgs ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Guangzhoushikaermansixinxikejiyouxiangongsi..(pc)
Related: [-]
8 8 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Liu, Lance) Modified on 5/8/2024 (pc).
Related: [-]
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PATENT FORM. Notice to Attorney Lance Liu to RE-FILE Document No. 7 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney.The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form is not correct; Date Filed Field Error. Re-file the document using the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 120 Patent/Trademark PDF form. (vf)
Related: [-]
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lance Liu. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Guangzhoushikaermansixinxikejiyouxiangongsi. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party type was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
7 7 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Liu, Lance) Modified on 5/7/2024 (vf).
Related: [-]
6 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Guangzhoushikaermansixinxikejiyouxiangongsi a/k/a Marycele Official, re:2 Complaint. Document filed by Jiaxiang Ye..(Liu, Lance)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Judge Philip M. Halpern is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Gary Stein to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only..(tro)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 04/29 12:44 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lance Liu. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 18:1341; Jury Demand code n (None);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 35:271; the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff);. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 04/29 12:45 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 04/29 12:47 PM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 04/29 12:47 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 04/29 12:50 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lance Liu to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the incorrect party name whom summons is for was listed on the docket text. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient AO 120/121 Form Mon 04/29 12:51 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PATENT FORM. Notice to Attorney Lance Liu to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Notice (Other). The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form;.. Re-file the document using the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 120 Patent/Trademark PDF form. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 27, 2024
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Sat 04/27 11:25 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jiaxiang Ye, re:2 Complaint. Document filed by Jiaxiang Ye..(Liu, Lance)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Sat 04/27 11:14 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Liu, Lance)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs notice Notice (Other) Sat 04/27 10:57 AM
NOTICE of AO 120 for Patent re:2 Complaint. Document filed by Jiaxiang Ye..(Liu, Lance)
Related: [-]
2 2 6 pgs cmp Complaint Sat 04/27 10:39 AM
COMPLAINT against Guangzhoushikaermansixinxikejiyouxiangongsi. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29279725)Document filed by Jiaxiang Ye..(Liu, Lance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Copy of Official Patent,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit Offer for Sale
1 1 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 04/27 10:34 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lance Liu on behalf of Jiaxiang Ye..(Liu, Lance)
Related: [-]