New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Dora Lizette Irizarry
Referred: Robert M Levy
Case #: 1:24-cv-03166
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability)
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2024
Terminated:Nov 27, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 6:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Mohan's Custom Tailors, Inc.
Represented By
Pat Bathmanaban Pitchayan
Pitchayan & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Derrick Anderson
Represented By
Mars Khaimov
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
order Order Dismissing Case Wed 11/27 9:45 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re14 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Derrick Anderson. So Ordered by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 11/27/2024. (CC)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 11/25 2:21 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Derrick Anderson (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 11/07 10:34 AM
ORDER granting13 parties request that the Court stay this case and adjourn all upcoming deadlines and conferences and file a stipulation of dismissal by 12/16/24 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 11/7/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 10/31 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Derrick Anderson (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
minutes Initial Conference Hearing Thu 10/31 10:52 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Counsel present by telephone. The court made a settlement proposal, which counsel accepted, subject to approval by their clients. On consent, counsel agree that this settlement is binding unless any party advises the court by letter filed on ECF at or before 5 pm on 11/2/24 stating that it does not agree to the settlement proposed at this conference. Initial Conference Hearing held on 10/31/2024 (Levy, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
12 12 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 10/24 12:30 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Derrick Anderson (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Tue 09/24 2:35 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The telephone conference scheduled for 9/26/24 is adjourned to 10/31/24 at 10:30 a.m. before the Hon. Robert M. Levy, USMJ. Parties are directed to dial: 571-353-2301; and use Guest ID: 623827231. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 9/24/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
11 11 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 09/23 10:51 PM
Second MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Derrick Anderson. (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Fri 08/16 10:29 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The initial conference scheduled for 8/21/24 is adjourned to 9/26/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Parties are directed to dial: 571-353-2301; and use Guest ID: 623827231. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/16/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
10 10 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 08/14 3:15 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Derrick Anderson. (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/11 8:57 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference by telephone has been scheduled for August 21, 2024 at 2:30 p.m., before the Hon. Robert M. Levy, USMJ. Parties are directed to dial: 571-353-2301; and use Guest ID: 623827231. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/11/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IC Questionnaire,
Att: 2 Individual Rules
Friday, July 05, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/05 3:57 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Mohan's Custom Tailors, Inc.. (Pitchayan, Pat)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 06/05 11:14 AM
ORDER granting First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer -- Mohan's Custom Tailors, Inc. answer due 7/8/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 6/5/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 06/04 5:18 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Mohan's Custom Tailors, Inc.. (Pitchayan, Pat)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/04 5:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Pat Bathmanaban Pitchayan on behalf of Mohan's Custom Tailors, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Pitchayan, Pat)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/17 8:48 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Derrick Anderson. Mohan's Custom Tailors, Inc. served on 5/15/2024, answer due 6/5/2024. (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 04/29 11:03 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 04/29 11:02 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SDM)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 04/29 11:00 AM
Summons Issued as to Mohan's Custom Tailors, Inc.. (SDM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/29 8:36 AM
COMPLAINT Derrick Anderson against Mohan's Custom Tailors, Inc. filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17815550 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Derrick Anderson. (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons