Consolidated
Lead case: 1:24-md-03097

New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis J Liman
Case #: 1:24-cv-03236
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade)
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 6:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Chryso, Inc.
Defendant
Cinven Ltd.
Defendant
Cinven, Inc.
Defendant
Compagnie De Saint-Gobain S.A.
Defendant
Does 1-10
Defendant
GCP Applied Technologies Inc.
Defendant
Master Builders Solutions Admixtures US, LLC
Defendant
Master Builders Solutions Deutschland GmbH
Defendant
RPM International Inc.
Defendant
Saint-Gobain Corporation
Defendant
Sika AG
Represented By
Mark Geoffrey Weiss
Baker Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sika Corporation
Represented By
Mark Geoffrey Weiss
Baker Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Euclid Chemical Company
Plaintiff
J&L Imperium Industries, LLC
ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, 1700 S Riverfront Blvd
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
MIKE L. ROBERTS
Roberts Law Firm
contact info
Erich P. Schork
Barnow And Associates, P.C.
contact info
Sarah E. DeLoach
Roberts Law Firm
contact info
Erich Paul Schork
Roberts Law Firm Us, PC
contact info
William E. Hoese
Kohn, Swift & Graf, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
65 65 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 03/31 5:25 PM
ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL in case 1:23-cv-10875-LJL; granting (283) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Mr. Hamer is withdrawn as counsel of record, that his appearance is deemed withdrawn as of the date of this order, and that his email address be removed from the Court's CM/ECF service list in the above-captioned action. All future pleadings, notices, and other documents are to be served on the remaining counsel for Defendants Sika Corporation and Sika AG.. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/31/2025) Attorney MARK H HAMER terminated in case 1:24-md-03097-LJL Filed In Associated Cases: 1:24-md-03097-LJL et al. (ks)
Related: [-]