Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Karen S Marston
Case #: 2:24-cv-01789
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2024
Terminated:Jun 24, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 7:19 AM EDT
Defendant
CREDIT CONTROL, LLC
3300 Rider Trail S SUITE 500
Earth City, MO 63045
Represented By
BRENDAN H. LITTLE
Lippes Mathias LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
NHAN BUI
135 Chatham Street
Upper Darby, PA 19082
Represented By
STEPHEN MATTHEW DUNNE
Dunne Law Offices PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, June 24, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Mon 06/24 2:36 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 6/24/2024. 6/24/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
notice Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing Fri 06/21 2:56 PM
NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing - Rule 16 Pretrial Conference, scheduled for 6/25/2024(mr)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/10 1:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by NHAN BUI re: Stephen M. Dunne, Esq. served Summons and Complaint upon CREDIT CONTROL, LLC by REGISTERED AGENT. CREDIT CONTROL, LLC served on 6/10/2024, answer due 7/1/2024. (DUNNE, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
8 8 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 06/06 3:01 PM
ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/25/2024 04:00 PM IN Telephone Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 6/6/2024. 6/6/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/05 4:50 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by CREDIT CONTROL, LLC.(LITTLE, BRENDAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
6 6 misc Praecipe/Request Mon 06/03 12:13 PM
PRAECIPE TO WITHDRAW DOCUMENT (D.I. #5) filed on May 15, 2024. by NHAN BUI. (DUNNE, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/15 1:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by NHAN BUI re: Stephen M. Dunne served Summons and Complaint upon CREDIT CONTROL, LLC by Registered Agent. CREDIT CONTROL, LLC served on 5/15/2024, answer due 6/5/2024. (DUNNE, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/07 9:29 AM
NOTICE by NHAN BUI Amended Designation Form (DUNNE, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 04/30 10:35 AM
Summons Issued as to CREDIT CONTROL, LLC. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 4/30/2024 (sg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 04/29 3:40 PM
Summons Issued as to CREDIT CONTROL, LLC. (amas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 04/29 10:53 AM
COMPLAINT against NHAN BUI ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17429294.), filed by NHAN BUI.(DUNNE, STEPHEN) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/29/2024) (sbt). (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/29/2024) (sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit Case Management Form,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit G,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit H
misc Attorney Required Forms Mon 04/29 1:20 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Signature is missing. (sbt)
Related: [-]