Iowa Southern District Court
Judge:Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referred: Stephen B Jackson, Jr
Case #: 4:24-cv-00151
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 5:03 AM CDT
Defendant
Noufal Babu Palliparamban
Represented By
Zubair Khan
Trivedi & Khan P.C.
contact info
Adam Junaid
Frerichs Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
The Wittern Group, Inc.
Represented By
Dana Waterman Hempy
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
Jeffrey D. Harty
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
Lynn C. Herndon
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
116 116 respm Response/Resistance to Motion Tue 05/20 11:53 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re110 MOTION for Protective Order Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order Response with Certain Amendments to enter into a Stipulated Protective Order filed by Noufal Babu Palliparamban. Replies due by 5/27/2025.(Babu, Noufal)
Related: [-]
115 115 respm Response/Resistance to Motion Tue 05/20 3:02 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re111 First MOTION for Extension of Time For Scheduling Order/R16 Deadlines of Extension for Submission of Expert Disclosure Report by the Defendant and subsequent extension in discovery Plaintiff's Resistance to Defendant's Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by The Wittern Group, Inc.. Replies due by 5/27/2025.(Harty, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
114 114 order Hearing/Oral Argument Thu 05/15 11:50 AM
TEXT ORDER denying112 Plaintiff's Request for Status Conference. The Court's prior Order113 entered on this date directs the parties to proceed with discovery in good faith. The parties also need to respond to motions recently filed by both sides. In that regard, to minimize delay to the schedule, Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order110 by no later than May 20, 2025; Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines111 by no later than May 20, 2025. The Court will determine sua sponte whether a status conference is warranted. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/15/2025. (jeb)
Related: [-]
113 113 order Compel Thu 05/15 11:45 AM
ORDER terminating as moot105 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant's Answers to Interrogatories, Responses to Requests for Production, and Document Production. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/15/2025. (jeb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
112 112 motion Hearing/Oral Argument Tue 05/13 4:20 PM
Unresisted MOTION for Hearing/Oral Argument Plaintiff's Request for Status Conference by The Wittern Group, Inc..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 5/27/2025.(Harty, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A