Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Rossie D Alston, Jr
Referred: William B Porter
Case #: 1:24-cv-00703
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 7:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Brandon Houston
4509 Lark Lane
Alexandria, VA 22310
Defendant
Taurian Houston
337 Mount Support Road #504
Lebanon, NH 03766
Defendant
James Kelvin Johnson
2107677 Fairfax County Sheriff's Office Adult Detention Center 10520 Judicial Drive
Fairfax, VA 22030
Plaintiff
Standard Insurance Company
Gentry Locke Attorneys 10 Franklin Road SE, Suite 900
Roanoke, VA 24011
Represented By
Kevin W. Holt
Gentry Locke
contact info
Jacqueline Jean Herring
Hinshaw & Culbertson Llp (il-Na)
contact info


Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago
Thursday, March 13, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 03/13 4:15 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Interpleader Discharge. Standard is dismissed with prejudice from this action. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 3/13/2025. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
15 15 misc Waiver of Fri 08/30 8:55 AM
Waiver of re14 Memorandum in Support,13 MOTION for Interpleader Discharge Oral Argument by Standard Insurance Company (Holt, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
misc Notice of Correction Wed 08/28 8:46 AM
Notice of Correction: Filing user notified to file a Notice of Hearing or Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument re13 MOTION for Interpleader Discharge (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
14 14 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Mon 08/26 10:22 AM
Memorandum in Support re13 MOTION for Interpleader Discharge filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Holt, Kevin)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Mon 08/26 10:19 AM
MOTION for Interpleader Discharge by Standard Insurance Company.(Holt, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
12 12 service Affidavit of Service Wed 07/31 1:25 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in A Civil Action served on James Kelvin Johnson on May 9, 2024, filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Holt, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 07/15 2:24 PM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr. District Judge Anthony J Trenga no longer assigned to the case. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/28 1:35 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Standard Insurance Company. Brandon Houston waiver sent on 5/1/2024, answer due 7/1/2024. (Holt, Kevin)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/28 1:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Standard Insurance Company. Taurian Houston waiver sent on 5/1/2024, answer due 7/1/2024. (Holt, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
9 9 utility Interpleader Deposit Received (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Mon 05/20 10:36 AM
Interpleader Deposit Received (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) in the amount of $660,000 receipt #100007068 (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order Authorizing Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Tue 05/07 11:35 AM
It is hereby ORDERED: Standard Insurance Company is authorized to deposit, into the interest-bearing Disputed Ownership Fund established within the Court Registry Investment System, the $660,000 in life insurance benefits payable due to the death of Daphne Saunders-Johnson re4 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 5/7/2024. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Fri 05/03 1:57 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Jacqueline Jean Herring for Standard Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 5/3/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 05/01 1:48 PM
Summons Issued as to James Kelvin Johnson, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney
Monday, April 29, 2024
5 5 respoth Brief in Support Mon 04/29 4:55 PM
Brief in Support to4 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Standard Insurance Company's Motion to Deposit Funds Standard Insurance Company's Brief in Support of its Motion to Deposit Funds filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Holt, Kevin)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Deposit Interpleader Funds (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Mon 04/29 4:53 PM
MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Standard Insurance Company's Motion to Deposit Funds by Standard Insurance Company.(Holt, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/29 4:35 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacqueline Jean Herring and Certification of Local Counsel Kevin W. Holt Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9498522. by Standard Insurance Company. (Holt, Kevin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 04/29 4:23 PM
Proposed Summons (proposed) Summons in a Civil Action by Standard Insurance Company. (Holt, Kevin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/29 3:06 PM
Complaint Complaint for Interpleader ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9498025.), filed by Standard Insurance Company.(Holt, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Affidavit Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Jurisdiction Cases,
Att: 7 Affidavit Financial Interest Disclosure Statement
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 04/30 3:36 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]