Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Cristal C Brisco
Referred: Scott J Frankel
Case #: 3:24-cv-00346
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilites Act
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 7:12 AM EDT
Defendant
Mike Anderson Chrysler Dodge Super Center of Logansport, Inc.
Represented By
Brian L Mosby
Littler Mendelson Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Sarah Doty
Littler Mendelson Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Mediator
Kate Brogan
Plaintiff
Christopher Wood
Represented By
John H Haskin
John H Haskin & Associates LLC
contact info
Paul A Logan
John H Haskin & Associates LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
16 16 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Fri 05/16 4:17 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Christopher Wood. (Logan, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
15 15 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 04/17 12:33 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to the14 Report of Mediation filed by Kate Brogan, Dismissal Papers due by 6/2/2025.Text entry order by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 4/17/2025. (nae)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
14 14 adr Report of Mediation Wed 04/16 3:02 PM
REPORT of Mediation by Kate Brogan.(Brogan, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
13 13 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 08/14 12:35 PM
Pursuant to General Order 2024-22 and the retirement of Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr., this case is now reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel. (ksc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 08/07 3:41 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court ADOPTS, in part, by reference11 . Consistent with that plan, the Court now enters the instant Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order regarding the conduct of discovery and deadlines. The parties exchanged the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) on or before 7/26/2024.The last date for the parties to amend the pleadings without leave of court is 8/29/2024. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiff by 2/28/2025; and from defendant by 3/28/2025. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) is due every six weeks until trial. The last date for the completion of ALL DISCOVERY is 5/29/2025. The deadline to file any discovery-related nondispositive motion is 5/1/2025. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 6/30/2025. Parties have agreed upon Kate Brogan as mediator. The deadline for the parties to engage in mediation is 6/13/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/6/2024. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Thu 07/18 2:39 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mosby, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/27 12:46 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mike Anderson Chrysler Dodge Super Center of Logansport, Inc.. (Doty, Sarah)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/27 12:42 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Mike Anderson Chrysler Dodge Super Center of Logansport, Inc..(Mosby, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 05/29 5:22 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: per8 Notice Answer due 6/27/2024. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
8 8 notice Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer Tue 05/28 4:22 PM
AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Mike Anderson Chrysler Dodge Super Center of Logansport, Inc. ; answer due by June 27, 2024. (Doty, Sarah)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/28 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Doty on behalf of Mike Anderson Chrysler Dodge Super Center of Logansport, Inc. (Doty, Sarah)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/28 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L Mosby on behalf of Mike Anderson Chrysler Dodge Super Center of Logansport, Inc. (Mosby, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/13 2:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Wood. Mike Anderson Chrysler Dodge Super Center of Logansport, Inc. served on 5/6/2024, answer due 5/28/2024. (Haskin, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 04/30 11:06 AM
Summons Issued as to Mike Anderson Chrysler Dodge Super Center of Logansport, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 04/30 11:02 AM
***NEW CASE*** Judge Cristal C Brisco and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (jld)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/29 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A Logan on behalf of Christopher Wood (Logan, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/29 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John H Haskin on behalf of Christopher Wood (Haskin, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/29 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Mike Anderson Chrysler Dodge Super Center of Logansport, Inc.( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5558104.), filed by Christopher Wood.(Haskin, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons