Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Algenon L Marbley
Referred: Kimberly A Jolson
Case #: 2:24-cv-02033
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2024
Case in other court:Logan County, Ohio Court of Common Pleas, CV24030086
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 7:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Dolgen Midwest, LLC
Represented By
Evan Michael Schantz
Reminger Co., Lpa
contact info
D Patrick Kasson
Reminger Co. Lpa - Columbus
contact info
Defendant
Dollar General
Represented By
Evan Michael Schantz
Reminger Co., Lpa
contact info
D Patrick Kasson
Reminger Co. Lpa - Columbus
contact info
Plaintiff
Janice Kelly
Represented By
Shawn Dingus
Plymale & Dingus, LLC
contact info
Michael Guluzian
Plymale & Dingus
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/29 3:09 PM
DEFICIENCY ORDER re24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal: Plaintiff is ORDERED to either file a motion to dismiss under Rule 41(a)(2) or a stipulation of dismissal signed by all the parties on or before 5/8/2025. If she does not, the Court will hold a status conference on that day at 10:45 am, as previously ordered. (Doc. 23 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/29/2025. (er)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/28 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Janice Kelly (Guluzian, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
23 23 order Order Thu 04/17 8:42 AM
NOTATION ORDER - This case has been reported as settled. A telephonic status conference will be held on 5/8/2025 at 10:45 am, unless the dismissal is filed in the interim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/17/25. (jr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 04/02 9:10 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting20 Joint Motion to Extend Case Deadlines. Discovery due by 4/30/2025. Dispositive motions due by 4/30/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/2/25. (jr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
20 20 motion Extension of Time Tue 04/01 2:30 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/30/2025. by Defendants Dolgen Midwest, LLC, Dollar General. (Schantz, Evan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/25 4:21 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Janice Kelly Notice of Deposition (Guluzian, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
18 18 med Notice Setting Mediation Wed 03/19 11:24 AM
Notice of Mediation Conference: Mediator Matthew L. Fornshell to conduct mediation in Virtual via Teams Meeting. Mediation Hearing set for 4/9/2025 at 10:00 AM. (Fornshell, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
med Notice Designating Mediator Tue 03/04 9:51 AM
NOTICE DESIGNATING MEDIATOR: Matthew L Fornshell assigned as mediator to this case. Within 14 days, the mediator and parties will confer to set a date, time, and location for mediation in April 2025, or within 60 days of this notice . The mediator will then file a Notice Setting Mediation. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
17 17 notice Notice Determining Readiness of Mediation (Columbus) Wed 02/19 11:20 AM
NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at[LINK:ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov] within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in April 2025 . If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm EST on 3/3/2025 . (kk2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
16 16 notice Notice Determining Readiness of Mediation (Columbus) Wed 01/22 9:48 AM
NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at[LINK:ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov] within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in March 2025 . If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm EST on 2/3/2025 . (kk2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Thu 08/01 12:09 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Michael Guluzian substituting for Michael Shawn Dingus as to Plaintiff Janice Kelly. (Guluzian, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/05 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Michael Schantz for Defendants Dolgen Midwest, LLC, Dollar General (Schantz, Evan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/22 3:31 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Dolgen Midwest, LLC Notice of Service of Defendant Dolgen Midwest, LLC's Initial Disclosures (Schantz, Evan)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/20 11:01 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Janice Kelly Initial Disclosure of Witnesses (Dingus, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
11 11 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order Wed 05/15 2:13 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for 5/22/2024 has been VACATED. Joinder of Parties/Motions to Amend due by 6/30/2024. Initial Disclosures due by 5/22/2024. Discovery due by 1/31/2025. Clawback Agreement Deadline due by 1/31/2025. Dispositive motions due by 3/28/2025. Primary Expert due by 11/30/2024. Rebuttal Expert due by 12/31/2024. Case is referred to Mediation. Case referred to Clerk for assignment of mediator. Settlement Demand due by 1/31/2025. Response to Settlement Demand due by 2/28/2025. Mediation Deadline: 3/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/15/2024. (er)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
10 10 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 05/10 2:21 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Dolgen Midwest, LLC. (Kasson, D)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
9 9 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2) Thu 05/09 2:26 PM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Defendant Dolgen Midwest, LLC. (Kasson, D)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/09 2:13 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Dolgen Midwest, LLC, Dolgencorp of Texas, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dolgencorp of Texas, Inc. for Dolgen Midwest, LLC.. (Kasson, D)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/06 2:50 PM
DEFICIENCY ORDER: Defendant Dolgen Midwest, LLC is ORDERED to submit within TEN DAYS notices outlining its corporate relationships and the citizenship of each member of its limited liability company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/6/2024. (er)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/01 4:37 PM
AMENDED NOTICE re5 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio Pro Hac vice Rules as to Attorney. (jlk)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Clerks Notice to Pro Hac Vice Attorney Wed 05/01 2:56 PM
Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Michael Guluzian (0088263) and Evan M. Schantz (0101054). (jlk)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 05/01 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2024 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/30 3:08 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Dolgen Midwest, LLC. (jlk)
Related: [-]
2 2 5 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/30 3:08 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Dolgen Midwest, LLC, Dollar General, filed by Janice Kelly. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 04/29 2:44 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Logan County, Ohio Court of Common Pleas, case number CV24030086 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9942960), filed by Dolgen Midwest, LLC. (Kasson, D)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Answer of Defendant,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Notice of Controversy,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supp Civil Cover Sheet