Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Case #: 2:24-cv-00290
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2024
Terminated:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 5:21 AM CDT
Defendant
Shelby Logistics, Inc.
Plaintiff
Wallace & Sons' Wrecker Service, LLC
Represented By
James Andrew Holmes
The Law Office Of James Holmes, PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Shelby Logistics, LTD
Terminated: 07/04/2024


Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 02/11 10:51 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE (Motion(s)16 terminated). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/2025. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 02/07 9:00 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Wallace & Sons' Wrecker Service, LLC (Holmes, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
16 16 motion Default Judgment Mon 10/14 9:25 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Wallace & Sons' Wrecker Service, LLC.(Holmes, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, September 06, 2024
15 15 order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 09/06 8:20 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Shelby Logistics, Inc. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
14 14 misc Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Thu 09/05 3:40 PM
Request by Wallace & Sons' Wrecker Service, LLC for Clerk's Entry of Default against Shelby Logistics, Inc..(Holmes, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. A,
Att: 2 Ex. B,
Att: 3 Clerk's Entry of Default Judgment
Thursday, July 25, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 07/25 2:38 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Leave to Amend. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/25/2024. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 07/22 3:58 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shelby Logistics, Inc., filed by Wallace & Sons' Wrecker Service, LLC.(Holmes, James)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Leave to File Document Mon 07/22 3:56 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend and proposed Order by Wallace & Sons' Wrecker Service, LLC.(Holmes, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 18, 2024
minutes Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference Mon 07/22 3:15 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference held on 7/18/2024. Counsel for Plaintiff appeared. Counsel failed to appear on behalf of Defendant. Service has been effected upon Defendant with no responsive pleading filed before or on the answer due date. Court entered no scheduling orders at this time. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts) (aeb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 04, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Mon 07/08 8:59 AM
ORDER granting9 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss Shelby Logistics, LTD (Motion(s)9 terminated). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/4/2024. (CH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
9 9 motion Dismiss Tue 07/02 9:20 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss Shelby Logistics, LTD by Wallace & Sons' Wrecker Service, LLC.(Holmes, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 27, 2024
8 8 order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 06/27 9:38 AM
NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER - Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2024 at 09:30 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/26/2024. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/29 1:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wallace & Sons' Wrecker Service, LLC. Shelby Logistics, Inc. served on 5/24/2024. (Holmes, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 05/16 9:41 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Shelby Logistics, Inc.. (NKL)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 05/16 9:25 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's First Amended Orginal Complaint against Shelby Logistics, Inc., filed by Wallace & Sons' Wrecker Service, LLC.(Holmes, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/06 11:44 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wallace & Sons' Wrecker Service, LLC. Shelby Logistics, LTD served on 5/6/2024. (Holmes, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 04/29 4:59 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Shelby Logistics, LTD. (NKL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/29 3:26 PM
COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Original Complaint against Shelby Logistics, LTD ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10111502.), filed by Wallace & Sons' Wrecker Service, LLC.(Holmes, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/29 4:37 PM
Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (NKL)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 04/29 4:37 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (NKL)
Related: [-]