New Jersey District Court
Judge:Evelyn Padin
Referred: James B Clark
Case #: 2:24-cv-05734
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Non-Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2024
Terminated:Nov 25, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 7:35 AM EDT
Defendant
AYOOLA AJAKAIYE
2674 MERLIN COURT
ODENTON, MD 21113
Defendant
BOROUGH OF EDGEWATER POLICE DEPARTMENT
55 RIVER ROAD
EDGEWATER, NJ 07020
Defendant
OFFICER BRIELLE COLON
55 RIVER ROAD
EDGEWATER, NJ 07020
Defendant
COURTYARD BY MARRIOTT
3 PEMBROKE PLACE
EDGEWATER, NJ 07020
Defendant
SERGEANT JAMES DALTON
55 RIVER ROAD
EDGEWATER, NJ 07020
Defendant
OFFICER JOHN HANSEN
55 RIVER ROAD
EDGEWATER, NJ 07020
Defendant
LEVIN MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
975 US-22
Plainfield, NJ 07060
Defendant
MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC.
10400 FERNWOOD ROAD
BETHESDA, MD 20817
Defendant
OFFICER ROBERT MCCARTHY
55 RIVER ROAD
EDGEWATER, NJ 07020
Defendant
ONE MAIN STREET EDGEWATER, LLC
485 West Putnam Avenue
Greenwich, CT 06830
Defendant
PEMBROKE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT
2 MAIN STREET
EDGEWATER, NJ 07020
Defendant
PEMBROKE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC
1 COMMERCE PLAZA 99 WASHINGTON AVENUE STE 805-A
ALBANY, NY 12210
Defendant
DETECTIVE JORGE VENEGAS
55 RIVER ROAD
EDGEWATER, NJ 07020
Plaintiff
GIOVANNI RIVERA
Represented By
WALTER D. NEALY
Walter D Nealy, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, November 25, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case (4m, 41.1) Mon 11/25 3:33 AM
Order for Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m). Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 11/25/2024. (bt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Call for Dismissal Thu 11/14 1:36 PM
Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m). Motion set for 11/21/2024 before Judge Evelyn Padin. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 05/01 2:55 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to AYOOLA AJAKAIYE, BOROUGH OF EDGEWATER POLICE DEPARTMENT, BRIELLE COLON, COURTYARD BY MARRIOTT, JAMES DALTON, JOHN HANSEN, LEVIN MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC., ROBERT MCCARTHY, ONE MAIN STREET EDGEWATER, LLC, PEMBROKE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, PEMBROKE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC, JORGE VENEGAS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 05/01 2:54 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/30 4:48 PM
Case assigned to Judge Evelyn Padin and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/29 9:50 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15327206) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GIOVANNI RIVERA.(NEALY, WALTER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit EXH A - POLICE SUMMONS,
Att: 3 Exhibit EXH B - PHOTOS OF P'S INJURIES,
Att: 4 Exhibit EXH C - PHOTO OF PARKING GARAGE SIGN,
Att: 5 Exhibit EXH D - PHOTO OF PRIVATE PKG SIGNAGE,
Att: 6 Statement RULE 7.1 STATEMENT