Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:24-bk-10913
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Sep 12, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Jambys, Inc.
228 Park Avenue South PMB 49630
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Katherine R. Beilin
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden, P.C.
contact info
Amy M Oden
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden PC
contact info
Henry Jon Jaffe
Pashmanstein Walder Hayden PC
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 3:26 PM EST
Attorney
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden, P.C.
Represented By
Joseph Charles Barsalona II
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
BedABox, LLC d/b/a ShipMonk LLC
Represented By
Robert Alan Weber
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Settle, Inc.
Represented By
Eric J. Monzo
Morris James LLP
contact info
Jason S. Levin
Morris James LLP
contact info
Scott Olson
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Nicholas R Marcus
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Creditor
Talent Arts Fashion Design, Ltd.
Represented By
Ricardo Palacio, Esq
Ashby & Geddes, P. A.
contact info
Interested Party
GLOBAL FUNDING EXPERTS, LLC
27-01 QUEENS PLAZA NORTH SUITE 802
Long Island, NY 11101
Represented By
Shanna Kaminski
contact info
Mary E. Augustine
A M Saccullo Legal, LLC
contact info
Mark T Hurford
A.M. Saccullo Legal, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
United First, LLC
Represented By
Mary E. Augustine
A M Saccullo Legal, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Velocity Capital Group, LLC
Represented By
Mary E. Augustine
A M Saccullo Legal, LLC
contact info
Trustee
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder LLC 1204 N. King Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Hannah J McCollum
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
199 199 misc Operating Report Wed 04/30 5:18 PM
Quarterly Operating Report for Filing Period 03/31/2025 Filed by Jambys, Inc.. (Barsalona II, Joseph)
Related: [-]