California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:24-cv-03532
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2024
Re-opened:Aug 06, 2024
Terminated:Aug 01, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 3:34 AM PDT
Defendant
Strong Studios, Inc.
Represented By
David G. Halm
Quintairos Prieto Wood And Boyer PA
contact info
Defendant
David Ozer
Represented By
Michael S Chernis
Chernis Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Kevin V Duncan
Represented By
Michael Gregory Freedman
Freedman Firm PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ravenwood-Productions LLC
Represented By
Michael Gregory Freedman
Freedman Firm PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Todd Major
Terminated: 07/22/2024
Represented By
David G. Halm
Quintairos Prieto Wood And Boyer PA
contact info
Defendant
Unbounded Media Corporation
Terminated: 07/22/2024
Represented By
David G. Halm
Quintairos Prieto Wood And Boyer PA
contact info
Defendant
Larry Swets
Terminated: 07/22/2024
Represented By
David G. Halm
Quintairos Prieto Wood And Boyer PA
contact info
Defendant
Strong Technical Services, Inc.
Terminated: 07/22/2024
Represented By
David G. Halm
Quintairos Prieto Wood And Boyer PA
contact info
David G Halm
Quintairos Prieto Wood And Boyer PA
contact info
Defendant
Strong Signatures, LLC
Terminated: 08/06/2024
Represented By
David G. Halm
Quintairos Prieto Wood And Boyer PA
contact info
Defendant
Strong Global Entertainment
Terminated: 07/22/2024
Represented By
David G. Halm
Quintairos Prieto Wood And Boyer PA
contact info
David G Halm
Quintairos Prieto Wood And Boyer PA
contact info
Defendant
Safehaven 2022, Inc.
Terminated: 07/22/2024
Represented By
David G. Halm
Quintairos Prieto Wood And Boyer PA
contact info
David G Halm
Quintairos Prieto Wood And Boyer PA
contact info
Defendant
Mark Roberson
Terminated: 07/22/2024
Represented By
Justin Arnold Bubion
Quintairos Prieto Wood And Boyer PA
contact info
David G. Halm
Quintairos Prieto Wood And Boyer PA
contact info
David G Halm
Quintairos Prieto Wood And Boyer PA
contact info
Defendant
Peter Odiorne
Terminated: 07/22/2024
Defendant
Matt Harton
Terminated: 07/22/2024
Defendant
Kyle Cerminara
Terminated: 07/22/2024
Defendant
Hassan Baqar
Terminated: 07/22/2024


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
47 47 misc Status Report Tue 05/06 8:20 PM
STATUS REPORT and Joint Stipulation filed by Defendant David Ozer.(Chernis, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 14, 2025
46 46 2 pgs order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 02/14 12:17 PM
ORDER STAYING ACTION UNTIL MAY 6, 2025 [DKT. 45] by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The Court ORDERS as follows: 1. This action is STAYED until May 6, 2025. 2. The parties shall FILE a joint status report on or before May 6, 2025, regarding Defendant David Ozer's ("Ozer") sentencing in United States of America v. Ozer, Case No. 2:24-cr-00463-SB. 3. This Order does not preclude the parties from filing a renewed stipulation to stay. (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
45 45 misc Status Report Mon 02/10 5:52 PM
STATUS REPORT And Stipulation To Continue Stay filed by Defendant David Ozer.(Chernis, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
44 44 3 pgs order Withdraw as Attorney Wed 01/08 2:34 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTION OF CHERNIS LAW GROUP P.C. TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS DAVID OZER AND STRONG STUDIOS, INC. [DKT. 43] by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha Denying43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney: Accordingly, the court DENIES the Motion. If new counsel appears on behalf of Defendants, CLG may renew its motion to withdraw or seek to substitute new counsel for CLG with Defendants' consent. (see document for further details) (bm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
43 43 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 12/11 5:33 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Chernis Law Group P.C. to Withdraw as Attorney For Defendants Ozer and Strong Studios Inc filed by Attorney David Ozer, Strong Studios, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/10/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Chernis, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 5 pgs Declaration Michael Chernis,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
42 42 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 12/10 3:06 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: In light of the court's stay of this action, (Dkt.41 ), the Scheduling Conference set for December 20, 2024, is VACATED, see (Dkt.37 ). IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
41 41 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 11/26 3:43 PM
ORDER APPROVING IN PART STIPULATION FOR TEMPORARY STAY OF CIVIL CASE DURINGPENDENCY OF CRIMINAL CASE40 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha:1. This action is STAYED until February 11, 2025. 2. The parties shall FILE a joint status report on or before February 11, 2025, regarding Defendant David Ozer's sentencing in in USA v. Ozer, Case No. 2:24-cr-00463-SB. 3. This Order does not preclude the parties from filing a renewed stipulationto stay. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
40 40 stip Stay Case Mon 11/18 11:56 AM
STIPULATION to Stay Case pending resolution of overlapping criminal case filed by defendant David Ozer, Strong Studios, Inc..(Chernis, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
39 39 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 11/06 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants David Ozer, Strong Studios, Inc., (Chernis, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
38 38 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Wed 11/06 10:14 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Answer(s) by David Ozer, and Strong Studios, Inc.34 ,35 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. A notice of interested parties shall be filed no later than 5 days from entry of this Order. (lc)
Related: [-]
37 37 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 11/05 11:59 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2024 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 11/05 10:14 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Answers to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)34 ,35 by David Ozer and Strong Studios, Inc. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
35 35 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 11/04 2:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by defendant Strong Studios, Inc..(Attorney Michael S Chernis added to party Strong Studios, Inc.(pty:dft))(Chernis, Michael)
Related: [-]
34 34 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 11/04 2:11 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by defendant David Ozer.(Chernis, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
32 32 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Tue 10/01 1:43 PM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 4, 2024 filed by defendant David Ozer.(Chernis, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, August 12, 2024
31 31 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Mon 08/12 5:03 PM
ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY MORE THAN 30 DAYS by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Having reviewed the Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint29 , and finding good cause therefor, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants David Ozer and Strong Studios, Inc. shall have until October 4, 2024, to respond to the Complaint. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
30 30 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Case Reopened Tue 08/06 4:39 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On July 31, 2024, Plaintiffs Ravenwood-Productions LLC and Kevin V. Duncan and Defendants Mark Roberson, Todd Major, Kyle Cerminara, Larry Swets, Hassan Baqar, Matt Harton, Peter Odiorne, Safehaven 2022, Inc., Unbounded Media Corporation, Strong Technical Services, Inc. and Strong Global Entertainment, Inc. (collectively, "Dismissed Defendants" and with Plaintiffs, the "Parties") jointly submitted a Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice25 . On August 1, 2024, the court, in error, dismissed the entire action with prejudice26 .Having considered the Stipulation and finding good cause therefor, and in lightof the foregoing, the court hereby ORDERS: 1. The courts Order Dismissing Action (Dkt. 26) is STRICKEN. 2. The Clerk shall administratively REOPEN the action. 3. All claims against the Dismissed Defendants are DISMISSED withprejudice. 4. The court shall RETAIN jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement entered into by the Parties. (Case reopened. MD JS-5.) (lc)
Related: [-]
29 29 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Tue 08/06 1:17 PM
First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 4, 2024 filed by defendant David Ozer.(Chernis, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
28 28 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 08/06 12:32 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING STIPULATION (DKT.27 ) by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court STRIKES the parties' STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY MORE THAN 30 DAYS for failure to attest on the signature page of the document that all other signatories listed, who electronically signed with a "s" and on whose behalf the filing is submitted, concur in the content of and have authorized the filing. See Local Rule 5-4.3.4. Any renewed stipulation must comply with all applicable statutes and Local Rules. Failure to comply with all applicable statutes and Local Rules in any renewed stipulation, including Local Rule 5-4.3.4, may result in the denial of the stipulation with prejudice. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
27 27 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Mon 08/05 3:34 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 4, 2024 filed by defendant David Ozer.(Attorney Michael S Chernis added to party David Ozer(pty:dft))(Chernis, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 01, 2024
26 26 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 08/01 4:37 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On July 31, 2024, the parties filed a Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice dismissing the action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)25 . Having considered the Stipulation and finding good cause therefor, the court hereby ORDERS: 1. All dates and deadlines governing this action are VACATED. 2. The court DISMISSES the action with prejudice. 3. The court RETAINS jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement entered into by the parties. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
25 25 stip Dismiss Case Wed 07/31 2:06 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by Defendant Mark Roberson, Safehaven 2022, Inc., Strong Global Entertainment, Strong Signatures, LLC, Strong Studios, Inc., Strong Technical Services, Inc., Larry Swets, Unbounded Media Corporation.(Attorney David G. Halm added to party Strong Signatures, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David G. Halm added to party Strong Studios, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David G. Halm added to party Larry Swets(pty:dft), Attorney David G. Halm added to party Unbounded Media Corporation(pty:dft))(Halm, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 22, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order Mon 07/22 12:08 PM
ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL23 [by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Having considered the Notice of Dismissal and finding good cause therefor, the court hereby ORDERS: 1. All dates and deadlines governing this action are VACATED. 2. The court DISMISSES without prejudice the action as to the Dismissed Defendants. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 21, 2024
23 23 1 pgs notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Sun 07/21 10:57 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Kevin V Duncan, Ravenwood-Productions LLC pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Hassan Baqar, Kyle Cerminara, Matt Harton, Todd Major, Peter Odiorne, Mark Roberson, Safehaven 2022, Inc., Strong Global Entertainment, Strong Technical Services, Inc., Larry Swets, Unbounded Media Corporation. (Freedman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
22 22 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Tue 07/16 3:37 PM
ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY MORE THAN 30 DAYS21 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha : Defendants Mark Roberson, Todd Major, Kyle Cerminara, Larry Swets, Hassan Baqar, Strong Technical Services, Inc., Safehaven 2022, Inc., Unbounded Media Corporation, and Strong Global Entertainment, Inc. shall have until August 21, 2024 to respond to the Complaint. (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
21 21 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 07/12 4:07 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Safehaven 2022, Inc. answer now due 8/21/2024; Mark Roberson answer now due 8/21/2024; Todd Major answer now due 8/21/2024; Hassan Baqar answer now due 8/21/2024; Kyle Cerminara answer now due 8/21/2024; Strong Global Entertainment answer now due 8/21/2024; Strong Technical Services, Inc. answer now due 8/21/2024; Larry Swets answer now due 8/21/2024; Unbounded Media Corporation answer now due 8/21/2024, filed by DEFENDANT Safehaven 2022, Inc.; Mark Roberson; Todd Major.(Attorney David G. Halm added to party Todd Major(pty:dft))(Halm, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
20 20 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Tue 06/11 9:32 AM
ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY MORETHAN 30 DAYS18 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Defendants shall have until July 22, 2024 to respond to the Complaint. (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
19 19 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 06/07 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Mark Roberson, Safehaven 2022, Inc., Strong Technical Services, Inc., (Halm, David)
Related: [-]
18 18 stip Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 06/07 3:00 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendant Mark Roberson, Safehaven 2022, Inc., Strong Technical Services, Inc..(Attorney David G Halm added to party Mark Roberson(pty:dft), Attorney David G Halm added to party Safehaven 2022, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David G Halm added to party Strong Technical Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Halm, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 06, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Thu 06/06 2:36 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Stipulation for Sanctions,,, Stipulation for Protective Order, Stipulation for Order,14 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The document is stricken.Other: Refer to CM/ECF No. 15. (lc)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 06/06 2:29 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 06/06 8:58 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Stipulation for Sanctions,,, Stipulation for Protective Order,,, Stipulation for Order,,14 by Defendant Mark Roberson. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: SEE BELOW UNDER OTHER. 1) Filer Erroneously Selected two extra reliefs "sanctions" and "protective order" which filing was Not Seeking ; ONLY the last relief "order" is applicable, since Filer seeking Only extension of time to answer and also to continue pending hearing. 2) Filer attached Notice of Interested party instead of filing separately under its own specific event. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
14 14 stip Sanctions Protective Order Wed 06/05 4:09 PM
STIPULATION for Sanctions against No one, STIPULATION for Protective Order, STIPULATION for Order [PROPOSED] ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) filed by Defendant Mark Roberson.(Attorney Justin Arnold Bubion added to party Mark Roberson(pty:dft))(Bubion, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 DISCLOSURE AND LOCAL RULE 7.1-1 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES,
Att: 2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3)
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/05 3:55 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kevin V Duncan. upon David Ozer waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/4/2024, answer due 8/5/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Marc Williams. (Freedman, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/05 3:54 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kevin V Duncan. upon Hassan Baqar waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/21/2024, answer due 7/22/2024; Kyle Cerminara waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/21/2024, answer due 7/22/2024; Todd Major waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/21/2024, answer due 7/22/2024; Mark Roberson waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/21/2024, answer due 7/22/2024; Safehaven 2022, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/21/2024, answer due 7/22/2024; Strong Technical Services, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/21/2024, answer due 7/22/2024; Larry Swets waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/21/2024, answer due 7/22/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Edward Ruberry. (Freedman, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/05 3:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kevin V Duncan. upon Matt Harton waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/24/2024, answer due 7/23/2024; Peter Odiorne waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/24/2024, answer due 7/23/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Michael Moirano. (Freedman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
10 10 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Fri 05/31 2:02 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-03532-FLA-ASx. (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
9 9 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Wed 05/29 4:38 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-03532 CAS(ASx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/30 6:26 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Hassan Baqar, Kyle Cerminara, Matt Harton, Todd Major, Peter Odiorne, David Ozer, Mark Roberson, Safehaven 2022, Inc., Strong Signatures, LLC, Strong Studios, Inc., Strong Technical Services, Inc., Larry Swets, Unbounded Media Corporation. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 04/30 6:24 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 04/30 6:24 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 04/30 6:23 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 04/29 8:29 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Kevin V Duncan, Ravenwood-Productions LLC. (Freedman, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 04/29 8:28 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Freedman, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Mon 04/29 8:26 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Kevin V Duncan, Ravenwood-Productions LLC. (Freedman, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 36 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 04/29 6:37 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37377618 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Ravenwood-Productions LLC, Kevin V Duncan. (Attorney Michael Gregory Freedman added to party Kevin V Duncan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Gregory Freedman added to party Ravenwood-Productions LLC(pty:pla))(Freedman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A