California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00174
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 30, 2024 12:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Eric Carmona, Jr. (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Brittany L. Sherron
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info

GPO Mar 18 2025
ORDER Denying Motion to Dismiss Indictment (ECF No. 36) as to Eric Carmona Jr. (1). Signed by District Judge James E. Simmons, Jr on 3/18/2025. (maq)

Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 12:26 AM PDT
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Eric Carmona, Jr (1) count(s) 1. (cc: Pretrial Services) (maq) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/26/2024) (ddf).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted