California Northern District Court
Judge:Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 4:24-cv-02542
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 3:55 AM PDT
Defendant
Matthew D. Emrich
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Tim H. Kim
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Danielle Lehman
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
San Francisco Asylum Office (USCIS)
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Ur Jaddou
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Sandeep Kaur
Represented By
Arash Yasrebi
Yasrebi Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, January 23, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 01/23 7:37 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sandeep Kaur (Yasrebi, Arash)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 08/02 9:15 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 14 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings. Joint Status Report or Order for Dismissal due by 1/23/2025. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
14 14 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 07/31 11:04 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS filed by Matthew D. Emrich, Tim H. Kim, Danielle Lehman, San Francisco Asylum Office (USCIS), United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), Ur Jaddou. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
13 13 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 07/09 8:48 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 12 Stipulation to Extend time within which defendants must file a Response. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/28/2024. Cross Motions due by 10/3/2024. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
12 12 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 07/02 3:23 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME WITHIN WHICH DEFENDANTS MUST FILE A RESPONSE filed by Matthew D. Emrich, Tim H. Kim, Danielle Lehman, San Francisco Asylum Office (USCIS), United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), Ur Jaddou. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 07/02 3:22 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Matthew D. Emrich, Tim H. Kim, Danielle Lehman, San Francisco Asylum Office (USCIS), United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), Ur Jaddou.. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/02 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 05/30 6:40 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sandeep Kaur.. (Yasrebi, Arash)
Related: [-]
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 05/30 8:12 AM
SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 6/13/2024. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 05/15 8:18 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 5/29/2024. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Summons Issued as to USA Wed 05/01 10:41 AM
Summons Issued as to Matthew D. Emrich, Tim H. Kim, Danielle Lehman, San Francisco Asylum Office (USCIS), United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), Ur Jaddou., Summons Issued as to Matthew D. Emrich, Tim H. Kim, Danielle Lehman, San Francisco Asylum Office (USCIS), United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Tue 04/30 2:35 PM
Proposed Summons.(Yasrebi, Arash)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Monday, April 29, 2024
4 4 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Mon 04/29 1:14 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 04/29 9:21 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/13/2024. (wsm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 04/29 8:58 AM
Proposed Summons.(Yasrebi, Arash)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 04/29 1:13 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . [err102] The names on the summons must be exactly as shown on the Complaint. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 2 Proposed Summons filed by Sandeep Kaur (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 28, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19362615.). Filed by Sandeep Kaur.(Yasrebi, Arash)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet