Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Patricia M Mayer
Case #: 4:24-bk-11442
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2024
Terminated:Sep 06, 2024

Debtor
CSF Transportation, LLC
1496 Stonemill Dr
Elizabethtown, PA 17022-9438
Represented By
THOMAS W. FLECKENSTEIN
Thomas W. Fleckenstein Attorney At Law
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
CHRISTINE C. SHUBERT
821 Wesley Avenue
Ocean City, NJ 08226
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of United States Trustee Robert N.C. Nix Federal Building 900 Market Street Suite 320
Philadelphia, PA 19107


Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 12:06 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 04/30 9:44 AM
Receipt of Voluntary petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-11442 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A25692151. Fee Amount $ 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 04/30 9:40 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-individual . Fee Amount $338 Filed by CSF Transportation, LLC. Government Proof of Claim Deadline: 10/28/2024. Statement of Corporate Ownership due 05/14/2024. (FLECKENSTEIN, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Matrix List of Creditors Tue 04/30 9:41 AM
Matrix List of Creditors Filed. Number of pages filed: 2, Filed by THOMAS W. FLECKENSTEIN on behalf of CSF Transportation, LLC. (FLECKENSTEIN, THOMAS)
Related: [-]