Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Case #: 2:24-cv-00292
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2024
Case in other court:Harrison County, 71st Judicial District, 24-00238
Last checked: Sunday Oct 27, 2024 4:18 AM CDT
Defendant
Averitt Express Inc.
Represented By
Gregory Ryan Brenner
Cox PLLC
contact info
Molly Faye Scott
Mayer LLP
contact info
Lindsay Goodner Gorbach
Mayer Llp - Dallas
contact info
Defendant
Angela Lecomte
Represented By
Gregory Ryan Brenner
Cox PLLC
contact info
Molly Faye Scott
Mayer LLP
contact info
Lindsay Goodner Gorbach
Mayer Llp - Dallas
contact info
Mediator
Mark W. Gilbert
debbie@gmgtexas.com Gilbert Mediation Group 12001 N. Central Expwy Suite 650
Dallas, TX 75243
Plaintiff
David Cooks
Represented By
Vivian Paige Eldridge
Witherite Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Remotely Fri 05/09 2:59 PM
ORDER granting17 The Court ORDERS that the Parties, with the consent of the mediator, have leave to appear remotely at the Parties' May 13, 2025 mediation.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/08/2025. (mdj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
17 17 motion Appear Remotely Wed 05/07 2:56 PM
AGREED MOTION for Leave to Appear Remotely (Mediation) by All Defendants.(Gorbach, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion to Allow Remote Attendance for Mediation
Friday, June 28, 2024
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/28 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Submission of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Averitt Express Inc., Angela Lecomte (Gorbach, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc State Court Records Fri 06/28 1:47 PM
State Court Records Filed by Averitt Express Inc., Angela Lecomte .(Gorbach, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Petition,
Att: 3 Exhibit Proof of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit Proof of Service,
Att: 5 Exhibit Executed Citation,
Att: 6 Exhibit Defendants Answer,
Att: 7 Exhibit Notice of Removal
14 14 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 06/28 1:41 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) AND (2) Disclosure Statement filed by Averitt Express Inc., Angela Lecomte (Gorbach, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/28 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Submission of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by David Cooks (Eldridge, Vivian)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order Fri 06/14 1:02 PM
DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2025 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Jury Selection set for 10/6/2025 at 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/14/2024. (NKL)
Related: [-]
11 11 8 pgs order Order Fri 06/14 12:14 PM
DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/14/2024. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediator Thu 06/13 8:59 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Mark Gilbert is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/12/2024. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 05/29 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Molly Faye Scott on behalf of Averitt Express Inc., Angela Lecomte (Scott, Molly)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 05/29 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Ryan Brenner on behalf of Averitt Express Inc., Angela Lecomte (Brenner, Gregory)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/29 1:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Additional Counsel and Designation of Lead Counsel by Averitt Express Inc., Angela Lecomte (Gorbach, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/29 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Additional Counsel and Designation of Lead Counsel by Averitt Express Inc., Angela Lecomte (Gorbach, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge Wed 05/29 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Lindsay Goodner Gorbach on behalf of Averitt Express Inc., Angela Lecomte (Gorbach, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference Mon 06/10 4:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference held on 5/29/2024. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked by the Court if any modifications needed to be made to the Discovery Order and/or Docket Control Order and whether there was a need for the entry of a Protective Order. The parties requested the appointment of Mark Gilbert, Dallas, Texas as mediator. Docket Control Order: No requested changes at this time. Discovery Order: No requested changes at this time. No immediate need for Protective Order at this time. Court cautioned counsel to file Notices of Appearance by 5:00 PM, if applicable. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes) (aeb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
4 4 18 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 05/01 8:59 AM
NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER - Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2024 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/30/2024. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/30 11:19 AM
***ORIGINAL ANSWER FILED IN 71ST JUDICIAL DISTRICT HARRISON CO TX*** ANSWER to2 Complaint by Averitt Express Inc., Angela Lecomte.(CH)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 04/30 11:17 AM
***ORIGINAL PETITION FILE IN 71ST JUDICIAL DISTRICT HARRISON CO TX*** COMPLAINT against Averitt Express Inc., Angela Lecomte (Cause No 24-0238 , filed by David Cooks.(CH)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 04/30 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Angela Lecomte, Averitt Express Inc. from Harrison County, 71st Judicial District Court, case number 24-0238 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10112928), filed by Angela Lecomte, Averitt Express Inc..(Gorbach, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A1,
Att: 3 Exhibit A2,
Att: 4 Exhibit A3
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/30 11:11 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (CH)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Tue 04/30 11:12 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (CH)
Related: [-]