Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:John J Tharp, Jr
Case #: 1:24-cv-03484
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2024
Terminated:Aug 16, 2024
Case in other court:Cook County, Law Division, 2020L013117
Last checked: Sunday Oct 27, 2024 4:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Affordable Welding, US, Inc.
Defendant
IHC Construction Companies, LLC
Plaintiff
Owners Insurance Company
Represented By
Krysta Kaye Gumbiner
Dinsmore And Shohl Llp Chi Il
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 2:40 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
1 1 14 pgs COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by Owners Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21913266.(Gumbiner, Krysta)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Subcontractor Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Policy
2 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Owners Insurance Company by Krysta Kaye Gumbiner (Gumbiner, Krysta)
Related: [-]
3 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gumbiner, Krysta)
Related: [-]