Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodney Smith
Case #: 0:24-cv-60721
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:0501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2024
Terminated:Oct 31, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 27, 2024 5:12 AM EDT
Defendant
Gazeta Brazilian News Corporation
1100 S Federal Hwy #202
Deerfield Beach, FL 33441
Plaintiff
David Oppenheimer
Represented By
Marian V. Quintero
Sanders Law Group
contact info
Joel Benjamin Rothman
Sriplaw, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, October 31, 2024
23 23 misc Form AO 120/121 Thu 10/31 10:45 AM
FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (ls)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Final Default Judgment
22 22 2 pgs order Judgment - Default Thu 10/31 10:41 AM
FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of David Oppenheimer against Gazeta Brazilian News Corporation. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/30/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
21 21 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Thu 10/31 7:35 AM
ORDER granting20 Renewed Motion for Default Judgment. Case is Closed. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/30/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 10/31 10:37 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. Per Chambers - See DE#21 ORDER (sk)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
20 20 motion Default Judgment Mon 09/30 6:19 PM
Renewed MOTION for Default Judgment by David Oppenheimer.(Rothman, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Final Judgment,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Final Judgement,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1- Oppenheimer Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2- JBR Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3- Invoice
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 09/24 10:56 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Marian V. Quintero representing Oppenheimer, David (Plaintiff) withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/24/2024. (cbn)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
18 18 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 09/23 5:21 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff, David Oppenheimer by Marian V. Quintero for / by David Oppenheimer. Responses due by 10/7/2024.(Quintero, Marian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Wed 09/18 12:53 PM
ORDER denying16 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
16 16 motion Default Judgment Tue 08/27 12:37 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment by David Oppenheimer.(Quintero, Marian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Final Judgment,
Att: 2 Proposed Final Judgment,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1- Oppenheimer Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2- Quintero Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3- Invoice
Friday, August 16, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 08/16 2:27 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On or before September 16, 2024, Plaintiff shall show cause why this matter should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute or file a motion for entry of final default judgment. Show Cause Response due by 9/16/2024. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
14 14 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks Tue 06/04 10:48 AM
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction re 13 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es),. Correction Other. Notice to Attorney issued in error by clerk. No further action is needed by attorney. (drz)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Clerk's Notice to Filer - ELECTRONIC CASE, SUMMONS(ES) Tue 06/04 8:48 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) will not be issued. The number of days to respond to the Summons(es) is incorrect. Filer may file a Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) with the corrected summons attached. (translation only gives respondent 20 days instead of 21 days) (drz)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM Tue 06/04 8:41 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to GAZETA BRAZILIAN NEWS CORPORATION - Motions Terminated:11 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/4/2024. (drz)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
11 11 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 06/03 3:19 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Gazeta Brazilian News Corporation by David Oppenheimer.(Quintero, Marian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Marian V. Quintero in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Return of Service
Friday, May 24, 2024
10 10 order Order Striking Fri 05/24 9:27 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER STRIKING9 Defendant Gazeta Brazilian News Corporation's "Response, Set Mediation and/or Demand Jury Trial." The document was not filed by an attorney. A corporation is an artificial entity that can act only through agents, cannot appear pro se, and must be represented by counsel. Palazzo v. Gulf Oil Corp. , 764 F.2d 1381, 1385 (11th Cir. 1985). Motions terminated:9 MOTION Set Mediation re8 Answer to Complaint filed by Gazeta Brazilian News Corporation. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/24/2024. (cbn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
9 9 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/24 9:15 AM
Stricken per Order DE#10- MOTION Set Mediation re8 Answer to Complaint by Gazeta Brazilian News Corporation. (nan) See DE#8 for an Image of the Motion. Modified text on 5/24/2024 (drz)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/24 9:13 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Gazeta Brazilian News Corporation. (nan) (Address Updated)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 05/15 5:03 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by David Oppenheimer (Quintero, Marian)
Related: [-]
6 6 8 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Wed 05/15 4:04 PM
ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/6/2024 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 05/15 11:38 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by David Oppenheimer. Gazeta Brazilian News Corporation served on 5/3/2024, response/answer due 5/24/2024. (Quintero, Marian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
4 4 misc Form AO 120/121 Wed 05/01 11:47 AM
FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (nan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 05/01 11:41 AM
Summons Issued as to Gazeta Brazilian News Corporation. (nan)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 05/01 11:38 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/30 4:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Gazeta Brazilian News Corporation. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17491770, filed by David Oppenheimer.(Quintero, Marian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Registration,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summon(s)