Montana District Court
Judge:Brian Morris
Referred: John Johnston
Case #: 2:24-cv-00028
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 27, 2024 3:08 AM MDT
Defendant
Daniel S. Madison
Defendant
Greg Gianforte
Defendant
Sandra Hamilton
Defendant
Amy Hanson
Defendant
Jason J. Henderson
Defendant
Intrinsik Architecture
Defendant
Wayne Jennings
Defendant
Jaymie Larsen
Defendant
Jennifer Madgic
Defendant
Katherina Freche
Defendant
Regina J. McClendon
Defendant
Rob Pertzborn
Defendant
Neil Ramhorst
Defendant
Sandan LLC
Defendant
State of Montana
Defendant
US Bank
Defendant
Jim Veltkamp
Defendant
Chuck Winn
Defendant
Brad J. Certain
Defendant
At Your Service Cleaning & HOA Management Inc.
Defendant
Ben Abbey
Defendant
Auction.com LLC
Defendant
Thomas Boyce
Defendant
CB Properties LLC
Defendant
Mark Carpenter
Defendant
Cattail Creek Community Association
Defendant
City of Bozeman
Defendant
Doe[s] relative to CB Properties LLC
Defendant
Doe[s] relative to Cattail Creek Community Association
Defendant
Doe[s] relative to City of Bozeman
Defendant
Does Relative to HWM
Defendant
Does relative to Auction.com LLC
Defendant
Does relative to US Bank
Plaintiff
Cattail Creek Subdivision-Phase II
P.O. Box 1254
Bozeman, MT 59771
Plaintiff
Peter Thompson
2988 Blackbird Drive
Bozeman, MT 59718

GPO Nov 27 2024
ORDER re 11 Pro Se Response to Order, filed by Peter Thompson. Thompson is granted an extension of time to January 10, 2025, to provide proof of service of the summons and amended complaint on the persons and entities he names as Defendants in his amended complaint or show cause why this cause should not be dismissed, without prejudice. Thompson must immediately advise the Court of any change in this mailing address by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action without notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 11/27/2024. (MMS)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
80 80 misc Pro Se Transcript Order Form - SDM Fri 04/25 12:03 PM
PRO SE TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Peter Thompson for proceedings held on 3/24/2025 before Judge Hon. Judge Brian Morris. Court reporter Yvette Heinze. Type of transcript: 30-Day. Transcript due by 5/27/2025. (Thompson, Peter)
Related: [-]
79 79 appeal USCA Order - SDM Fri 04/25 11:08 AM
ORDER of USCA as to54 Pro Se Notice of Appeal filed by Peter Thompson. Petitioners have not demonstrated a clear and indisputable right to the extraordinary remedy of mandamus. No further filings will be entertained in this closed case. (MMS)
Related: [-]