California Northern District Court
Judge:Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Case #: 3:24-cv-02584
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2024
Terminated:Sep 23, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 27, 2024 2:06 AM PDT
Defendant
City of Fremont
City Attorney's Office 3300 Capitol Avenue
Fremont, CA 94538
Represented By
John Braden Robinson
Castillo Moriarty Tran And Robinson, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kaleb Durmas
1959 Burney Falls Dr
Stockton, CA 95206
Represented By
Andrea Margaret Henson
Where Do We Go
contact info
Plaintiff
Samantha Jost
46101 Warm Springs Blvd RM 113
Fremont, CA 94539
Represented By
Andrea Margaret Henson
Where Do We Go
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Patterson
38343 Canyon Heights Dr
Fremont, CA 94536
Represented By
Andrea Margaret Henson
Where Do We Go
contact info
Plaintiff
Danielle Rivers
Homeless
Fremont, CA 94536
Represented By
Andrea Margaret Henson
Where Do We Go
contact info
Plaintiff
Lester Rogers
50 W. Blossom Way
Hayward, CA 94541
Represented By
Andrea Margaret Henson
Where Do We Go
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberlee Sanchez
4400 Central Ave #303
Fremont, CA 94536
Represented By
Anthony David Prince
Law Officces Of Anthony D. Prince
contact info
Andrea Margaret Henson
Where Do We Go
contact info

GPO May 06 2024
ORDER Denying 1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; Granting Applications to Proceed In Forma Pauperis at 3, 11, 12, 14. Amended Complaint due by 6/3/2024.Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on May 6, 2024. (amolc1, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, September 20, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 09/20 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kaleb Durmas, Samantha Jost, Nicole Patterson, Danielle Rivers, Lester Rogers, Kimberlee Sanchez (Henson, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 08/20 10:29 AM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting as modified 30 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint. Amended Complaint due by 9/20/2024. Future requests for extensions not filed at least seven days in advance or that fail to comply with Civil Local Rule 6-2 will be denied.(amolc1, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
30 30 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 08/16 12:36 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to extend time to file an amended complaint filed by Kaleb Durmas, Samantha Jost, Nicole Patterson, Danielle Rivers, Lester Rogers, Kimberlee Sanchez. (Henson, Andrea)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 08/16 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Anthony David Prince on behalf of Kimberlee Sanchez (Prince, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
28 28 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 06/27 9:45 AM
ORDER GRANTING 27 Stipulated Request to Change Time. Plaintiffs' amended complaint is due August 20, 2024. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on June 27, 2024. (amolc1, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
27 27 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 06/26 4:55 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,23 Order, filed by Kaleb Durmas, Samantha Jost, Nicole Patterson, Danielle Rivers, Lester Rogers, Kimberlee Sanchez. (Henson, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
26 26 misc Mail Returned Mon 06/24 2:57 PM
Mail sent to Danielle Rivers returned as undeliverable re6 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Mail Returned Mon 06/24 1:56 PM
Mail sent to Samantha Jost returned as undeliverable re19 Order Referring Plaintiff to Federal Pro Bono Project, Case Stayed. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order Thu 05/30 10:22 AM
ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on 5/30/2024. (ads, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
24 24 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/30 3:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danielle Rivers, Kimberlee Sanchez, Nicole Patterson, Kaleb Durmas, Samantha Jost. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
22 22 misc Mail Returned Wed 05/29 10:40 PM
Mail sent to Danielle Rivers returned as undeliverable re16 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Mail Returned Wed 05/29 10:38 PM
Mail sent to Samantha Jost returned as undeliverable re16 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
20 20 utility Remark Thu 05/23 2:22 PM
Acknowledgement of Receipt from USMS, Regarding17 Summons Issued. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs order Order Referring Plaintiff to Federal Pro Bono Project ~Util - Case Stayed Thu 05/23 11:45 AM
Order REFERRING Plaintiffs to Federal Pro Bono Project and Staying Proceedings Pending Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on 5/23/2024. (ads, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
18 18 misc Mail Returned Wed 05/22 4:47 PM
Mail sent to Kimberlee Sanchez returned as undeliverable re 7 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing., Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,6 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
17 17 service Summons Issued Wed 05/08 4:54 PM
Summons Issued as to City of Fremont.(sfb, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USMS 285 Form
Monday, May 06, 2024
16 16 15 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 05/06 5:43 PM
ORDER Denying 1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; Granting Applications to Proceed In Forma Pauperis at 3 , 11 , 12 , 14 . Amended Complaint due by 6/3/2024.Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on May 6, 2024. (amolc1, COURTSTAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
15 15 5 pgs oth_sup Declaration in Support Mon 05/06 2:54 PM
Declaration of Kimberlee Sanchez filed byKimberlee Sanchez. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/06 2:53 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Samantha Jost. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
13 13 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/06 2:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nicole Patterson. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/06 2:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kaleb Durmas. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/06 2:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Danielle Rivers. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 minutes Motion Hearing Fri 05/03 4:35 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. Motion Hearing held on 5/3/2024 re 1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. TRO hearing held. Parties to immediately submit supplemental declarations and other materials referenced during the hearing. City agreed to accept service via email on counsel, by mail, or by personal delivery to the City Clerk. City may consolidate program participants at Motel 6. Matter submitted. Court to issue written order on motion for temporary restraining order. Total Time in Court: 1 hour 11 minutes. Court Reporter: Cathy Taylor. Plaintiff Attorney: Kimberlee Sanchez, Danielle Rivers, Samantha Just, Kaleb Durmas. Defendant Attorney: Bronwen Lacey, John Robinson. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/3/2024)
Related: [-]
9 9 oth_sup Declaration in Support Fri 05/03 2:58 PM
Declaration of Talia Rubin in Support of8 Opposition/Response to Motion (Supplemental) filed byCity of Fremont. Related [+] (Robinson, John)
Related: [-] 8
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Thursday, May 02, 2024
8 8 13 pgs respm Opposition/Response to Motion Thu 05/02 11:57 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byCity of Fremont.(Robinson, John)
Related: [-] 1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order
Att: 1 12 pgs Declaration of Talia Rubin,
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Wed 05/01 7:34 AM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing as to 1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order set for 5/3/2024 11:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/martinez-olguin-araceli-amo/] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Related [+] (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) copy placed in outgoing mail on 5/1/2024. Copy of notice emailed to Fremont City Attorney Rafael Alvarado at ralvarado@fremont.gov. Clerk called each individual plaintiff to advise them of the hearing date. Modified on 5/1/2024 (klh, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-] (s)6
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/30 6:00 PM
ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO MAINTAIN STATUS QUO AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Response due by noon on 5/2/2024. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2024 at 11:30 AM before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. Zoom instructions to follow. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on April 30, 2024. (amolc1, COURTSTAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) copy placed in outgoing mail on 5/1/2024. Copy of this order and TRO motion was emailed to to the Fremont City Attorney Rafael Alvarado at ralvarado@fremont.gov. on 4/29/2024. Modified on 5/1/2024 (klh, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/1/2024 (klh, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 04/30 5:18 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (krp, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 04/30 5:16 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kimberlee Sanchez. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/30 5:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kimberlee Sanchez. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Order Tue 04/30 5:14 PM
Proposed Order re1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Kimberlee Sanchez. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 35 pgs motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 04/30 5:12 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, Verified COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against City of Fremont. filed by Kimberlee Sanchez.(krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet