Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Jane M Beckering
Case #: 1:24-cv-00440
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2024
Terminated:Jun 21, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
16 16 appeal USCA Order Thu 11/07 3:29 PM
ORDER of USCA (certified copy) re appeal12 filed to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction ; no mandate to issue (ns) ( #1 Attachment USCA Judgment) (ns)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
14 14 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Hearing Fri 09/06 11:24 AM
ORDER denying motion for hearing13 ; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Fri 09/06 12:13 PM
Copy of Order on Motion for Hearing14 sent via U.S. Mail to Brian Keith Perry #775224 (ns)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
15 15 appeal Letter from CCA Regarding Appeal Fri 09/06 1:37 PM
LETTER FROM CCA regarding appeal12 assigning CASE NUMBER 24-1733 indicating that appeal has been docketed (ns)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
13 13 motion Hearing Mon 08/26 2:52 PM
MOTION for hearing on bond pending appeal by petitioner Brian Keith Perry #775224; (ns)
Related: [-]
12 12 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 08/26 2:50 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL re10 ,11 by petitioner Brian Keith Perry #775224 (ns)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
11 11 order Judgment Dismissing Case Fri 06/21 8:53 AM
JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case (no motion) Fri 06/21 8:52 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE for failure to cure deficiency; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Fri 06/21 10:11 AM
Copy of Judgment Dismissing Case11 , Order Dismissing Case (no motion)10 sent via U.S. Mail to Brian Keith Perry #775224 (ns)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/30 2:30 PM
NOTICE regarding intent to seek release on bond, by petitioner Brian Perry. (ns)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Amend/Correct Extension of Time Thu 05/30 2:28 PM
MOTION to amend/correct1 , MOTION for extension of time to pay a filing fee by petitioner Brian Keith Perry #775224; (ns)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
7 7 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case to DJ (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) Fri 05/10 1:12 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to District Judge Jane M. Beckering and Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green for all further proceedings (ns)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Statement Regarding Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/Habeas Case) Fri 05/10 1:09 PM
STATEMENT RE CONSENT by petitioner Brian Keith Perry #775224 requesting the case be assigned to a district judge (ns)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Fri 05/10 1:13 PM
Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case to DJ (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas)7 sent via U.S. Mail to Brian Keith Perry #775224 (ns)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
5 5 order Deficiency Order Tue 04/30 11:52 AM
DEFICIENCY ORDER: petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 5/28/2024 or the action will be dismissed filing fee to be submitted by 5/28/2024; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) Tue 04/30 11:31 AM
NOTICE to petitioner regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 5/21/2024 (ns)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Tue 04/30 11:33 AM
Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas)4 sent via U.S. Mail to Brian Keith Perry #775224 (ns)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Tue 04/30 12:17 PM
Copy of Deficiency Order,5 sent via U.S. Mail to Brian Keith Perry #775224 (ns)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
3 3 misc Letter Requesting Docket Sheet Tue 04/30 11:27 AM
LETTER from petitioner Brian Keith Perry #775224 requesting docket sheet; docket sheet mailed on 4/30/2024 (ns)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Proof of Service Tue 04/30 11:26 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by petitioner Brian Keith Perry #775224 re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus1 (ns)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 04/30 11:21 AM
PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Brian Keith Perry #775224 (ns)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Witness List