California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Charles Novack
Case #: 4:24-bk-40629
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2024
Creditor Meeting:May 29, 2024
Claims Deadline:Jul 09, 2024

Debtor
Caldwell-Roland Roofing, Inc.
PO Box 6919
Moraga, CA 94570-6919
Represented By
David A. Arietta
Law Offices Of David A. Arietta
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Paul Mansdorf
1569 Solano Ave. #703
Berkeley, CA 94707
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak
Office of the United States Trustee Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102


Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 12:03 AM PDT
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
crditcrd none Tue 04/30 2:58 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-40629 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00). Receipt number A33158892, amount $ 338.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 04/30 2:05 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $338. Filed by Caldwell-Roland Roofing, Inc.. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 05/14/2024. (Arietta, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business Asset) Tue 04/30 3:02 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2024 at 10:00 AM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Proofs of Claims due by 7/9/2024. (Arietta, David)
Related: [-]