Arizona District Court
Judge:Dominic W Lanza
Referred: Deborah M Fine
Case #: 2:24-cv-00948
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2024
Terminated:Jun 18, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM MST
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
6 6 order Clerks Judgment Tue 06/18 4:02 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's Order filed 5/3/2024, judgment of dismissal is entered. Petitioner to take nothing and this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. (KJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
5 5 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Fri 05/03 9:18 AM
ORDER: Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to do so within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Petitioner a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Habeas). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 5/2/2024. (KJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
4 4 misc Notice: Prisoner Case Subject to Electronic Filing Tue 04/30 3:25 PM
NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. Please review the attached documents. (KJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment Tue 04/30 3:23 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (KJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/30 3:22 PM
NOTICE by Jason Corey Bullard. (1 page) (KJ)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) Tue 04/30 3:20 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) filed by Jason Corey Bullard. (72 pages)(KJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope