Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-20178
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2024
Terminated:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 01, 2024 3:41 AM EDT
Defendant
Diego Roman Vizcon (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nicole Grosnoff
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Eli Rubin
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/20/2025 12:42 AM EDT
Monday, April 29, 2024
1 1 8 pgs INFORMATION as to Diego Roman Vizcon (1) count(s) 1. (fbn)
Related: [-]