Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-01230
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 02, 2024 2:32 AM CDT
Defendant
Miguel Angel Cortez-Meraz (1)
Represented By
Angela Saad Lindsey
The Lindsey Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 3:37 AM CDT
Friday, April 26, 2024
Arrest of Miguel Angel Cortez-Meraz (drda)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
Warrant Returned Executed as to Miguel Angel Cortez-Meraz. (drda)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Miguel Angel Cortez-Meraz. (drda)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Miguel Angel Cortez-Meraz. (drda)
Related: [-]