Colorado District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00020
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2024
Terminated:Feb 07, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday May 01, 2024 1:23 AM MDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Peter Andrew McNeilly
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Magdiel Sanchez-Urias (1)
Terminated: 02/07/2024
Represented By
Nancy Kardon
Kardon Law, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 4:22 AM MDT
Thursday, February 01, 2024
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Magdiel Sanchez-Urias (1). (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Information Sheet,
Att: 2 Affidavit
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to Magdiel Sanchez-Urias. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]