Original Case: 1:23-cv-01029

Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cvus-01755
Typecivil us
Nature of Suit114
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday May 01, 2024 8:55 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES
Represented By
Director, Commercial Litigation Branch, Civil Division, U.S. Department of Justice
United States Department of Justice
contact info
Sheryl L. Floyd
Department of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ASG SOLUTIONS CORP., dba American Systems Group
Represented By
David Demian
Finch, Thornton & Baird, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 5:56 AM EDT
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 04/26/2024. [1000855] Entry of Appearance is due on 05/14/2024. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/14/2024. Docketing Statement is due on 05/30/2024. Appellant's brief is due on 07/01/2024. [JSP] [Entered: 04/30/2024 10:13 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 7 pgs Civil Case Docketed