Tucker v. Assurant American Security Insurance Company Global P&C Claims
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah S Vance |
Referred: | Janis Van Meerveld |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01103 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | May 01, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, 24-02371 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 15, 2024 6:00 AM CDT |
Defendant
American Security Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Assurant American Security Insurance Company Global P & C Claims
|
|
Plaintiff
Randy Tucker
1749 Pace Boulevard
New Orleans, LA 70114 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 08, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Wed 05/08 10:09 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re5 Notice of Compliance. 1) Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to document 4. Clerk properly linked document to document 1. 2) Document does not contain Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section R Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate (1) Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cs) |
|
Tuesday, May 07, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal
Tue 05/07 12:24 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,, by American Security Insurance Company.(Burtchaell, Roy) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Compliance
Tue 05/07 12:22 PM
Notice of Compliance pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1447(b) by American Security Insurance Company re1 Notice of Removal,,4 Order.(Burtchaell, Roy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Petition as Served | ||
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 05/02 12:08 PM
DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal, filed by American Security Insurance Company. (cs) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 05/01 12:42 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S Vance and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Statement of Corporate Disclosure
Wed 05/01 12:00 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by American Security Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Assurant, Inc. for American Security Insurance Company (Burtchaell, Roy) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 05/01 12:00 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2024-02371 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10509716) filed by American Security Insurance Company.Attorney Roy A. Burtchaell added to party American Security Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Burtchaell, Roy) |
|
Att: 1 10 pgs State Court Pleadings Exhibit A - Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Policy, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Below Deductible Letter, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Record of Service on Louisiana Secretary of State, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet |