Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:James M Moody Jr
Case #: 2:24-cv-00088
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:May 01, 2024
Terminated:May 23, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 28, 2024 3:19 AM CDT
Amicus
March for Our Lives
Represented By
Jocelyn Jezierny
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
William R. Isasi
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
John David Graubert
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Amicus
Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence
Represented By
Jocelyn Jezierny
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
William R. Isasi
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
John David Graubert
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Amicus
Everytown for Gun Safety
Represented By
Jocelyn Jezierny
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
William R. Isasi
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
John David Graubert
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Amicus
Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence
Represented By
Jocelyn Jezierny
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
William R. Isasi
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
John David Graubert
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Represented By
Zachary Sherwood
U. S. Department Of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Keri Lane Berman
U. S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jeremy S. B. Newman
U. S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
United States Attorney General
Represented By
Zachary Sherwood
U. S. Department Of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Keri Lane Berman
U. S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jeremy S. B. Newman
U. S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Justice
Represented By
Zachary Sherwood
U. S. Department Of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Keri Lane Berman
U. S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jeremy S. B. Newman
U. S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Movant
Ohio, State of
Represented By
April Cotton
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Virginia, State of
Represented By
Kevin M. Gallagher
Virginia Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Martin Jordan Minot
Virginia Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Brendan T. Chestnut
New York Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Nicholas J. Bronni
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Brendan Chestnut
Virginia Attorney General'S Office
contact info
M. Jordan Minot
Virginia Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
West Virginia, State of
Represented By
Michael R. Williams
West Virginia Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Nicholas J. Bronni
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Michael Ray Williams
West Virginia Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Wyoming, State of
Represented By
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Ryan Schelhaas
Wyoming Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Nicholas J. Bronni
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Tennessee, State of
Represented By
Whitney Hermandorfer
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Brian Daniel Mounce
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Whitney D. Hermandorfer
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
South Dakota, State of
Represented By
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Charles D. McGuigan
South Dakota Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
South Carolina, State of
Represented By
Joseph D. Spate
South Carolina Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Nicholas J. Bronni
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Oklahoma, State of
Represented By
Garry M. Gaskins, II
Oklahoma Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
North Dakota, State of
Represented By
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Katie L Carpenter
North Dakota Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Katie L. Carpenter
North Dakota Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Nebraska, State of
Represented By
Zachary A. Viglianco
Nebraska Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
New Hampshire, State of
Represented By
Brandon F. Chase
New Hampshire Department Of Justice
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Nicholas J. Bronni
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Montana, State of
Represented By
Christian B. Corrigan
Montana Department Of Justice
contact info
Christian Brian Corrigan
Montana Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Nicholas J. Bronni
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Peter M. Torstensen, Jr
Montana Department Of Justice
contact info
Peter Martin Torstensen, Jr.
Montana Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Missouri, State of
Represented By
Bryce Beal
Missouri Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Nicholas J. Bronni
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald Maxey
Represented By
William Edward Trachman
Mountain States Legal Foundation
contact info
Michael D. McCoy
Mountain States Legal Foundation
contact info
William E. Trachman
Mountain States Legal Foundation
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Nicholas J. Bronni
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Kentucky, State of
Represented By
Zachary M. Zimmerer
Kentucky Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Aaron J Silletto
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Victor B. Maddox
Kentucky Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Aaron J. Silletto
Kentucky Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Kansas, State of
Represented By
Jesse A. Burris
Kansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Jesse A Burris
Office Of The Kansas Attorney General
contact info
Abhishek S Kambli
Office Of The Kansas Attorney General
contact info
Erin B. Gaide
Kansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Kris W Kobach
Office Of The Kansas Attorney General
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Nicholas J. Bronni
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Abhishek S. Kambli
Kansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Kris W. Kobach
Kansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Phillip Journey
Represented By
M. Frank Bednarz
Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute
contact info
Michael Frank Bednarz
Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute
contact info
Anna St. John
Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Iowa, State of
Represented By
Eric H. Wessan
Iowa Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Indiana, State of
Represented By
James A. Barta
Indiana Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Idaho, State of
Represented By
Joshua N. Turner
Idaho Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Nicholas J. Bronni
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Alan M. Hurst
Idaho Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Georgia, State of
Represented By
Stephen J. Petrany
Georgia Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Nicholas J. Bronni
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Chisholm Trail Antique Gun Association
Represented By
William Edward Trachman
Mountain States Legal Foundation
contact info
Michael D. McCoy
Mountain States Legal Foundation
contact info
William E. Trachman
Mountain States Legal Foundation
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Nicholas J. Bronni
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Allen Black
Represented By
William Edward Trachman
Mountain States Legal Foundation
contact info
Michael D. McCoy
Mountain States Legal Foundation
contact info
William E. Trachman
Mountain States Legal Foundation
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Nicholas J. Bronni
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Alaska, State of
Represented By
Aaron C. Peterson
Alaska Department Of Law
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Nicholas J. Bronni
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Alabama, State of
Represented By
Edmund G. LaCour, Jr.
Alabama Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Nicholas J. Bronni
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Arkansas, State of
Terminated: 05/23/2024
Represented By
John Timothy Griffin
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Tim Griffin
Attorney At Law
contact info
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Nicholas J. Bronni
Arkansas Attorney General'S Office
contact info

GPO May 23 2024
ORDER dismissing, without prejudice, the State of Arkansas; transferring this case to the United States District Court for the District of Kansas; and requesting the Clerk of the Court to transfer the case immediately. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/23/2024. (ldb)Notice: The terminated party will no longer receive filing notifications through CM/ECF. To continue receiving filing notifications, email t the description.)(cmn)the Clerk of Court and request reinstatement. Please refer to the CM/ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures for Civil Filings for information about when a terminated party must be served. (Docket text modified on 5/24/2024 to correc

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, August 26, 2024
91 91 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 08/26 2:31 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting90 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Martin Jordan Minot terminated. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/26/24. (amr)
Related: [-]
90 90 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 08/26 1:09 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Virginia, State of (Minot, Martin)
Related: [-]