Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:John D Russell
Case #: 4:24-cv-00201
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Case Filed:May 01, 2024
Terminated:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Monday Oct 28, 2024 3:44 AM CDT
Defendant
Green Country Building Materials, LLC
Represented By
James Newton Edmonds
Atkinson Haskins Nellis Brittingham Gladd & Fiasco
contact info
Ryan Christopher Alley
Atkinson, Brittingham, Gladd, Fiasco & Edmonds
contact info
Defendant
Clifton Hanson
Plaintiff
Covington Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Stasney Jody
Thompson, Coe, Cousins, & Irons LLP
contact info
James Richard Harmon
Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons, Llp (dallas)
contact info
Brently C Olsson
Cheek Law Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
46 46 order 02 - Minute Order Case - Dismissed/Terminated Ruling on Motion to Dismiss Tue 05/06 9:35 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge John D Russell : the motion to dismiss, Dkt. 45 , is granted, and the remaining deadlines and hearings are hereby stricken ; dismissing/terminating case (terminates case) ; granting45 Motion to Dismiss (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (clb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
utility Case - Terminate Civil/Miscellaneous Case Wed 05/07 10:55 AM
***Civil Case Terminated (see document number 46 ) (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
45 45 motion Dismiss Mon 05/05 5:04 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice and Brief in Support by Covington Specialty Insurance Company (Jody, Stasney)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
44 44 order 02 - Minute Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Tue 04/22 12:58 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge John D Russell : in addition to the conditions set forth in the Court's Order at Dkt. 42 , previous counsel for Mr. Hanson are directed to provide the Court with Mr. Hanson's mailing address and phone number for the court's docket. Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (clb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 42 Order,, Adding/Terminating Attorney(s),, Ruling on Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s),
Thursday, April 17, 2025
43 43 order 13 - Settlement Conference Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Thu 04/17 9:06 AM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): before ASJ Mark Banner (courthouse) ( Settlement Conference set for 5/19/2025 at 09:30 AM before Adjunct Settlement Judge) (jln, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
42 42 order 01 - Order Attorney - Added/Terminated Ruling on Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) Thu 04/03 5:40 PM
ORDER by Judge John D Russell , granting counsels' motion to withdraw with conditions as outlined in the Order ; terminating attorney Michael Franklin Smith; Donald Eugene Smolen, II; James Michael Fatigante and Mathew Scott Saint ; granting41 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (clb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
41 41 motion Withdraw Attorney(s) Fri 03/14 10:16 AM
MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) by Clifton Hanson (Smolen, Donald)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
40 40 order 01 - Order Attorney - Added/Terminated Ruling on Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) Fri 02/21 4:19 PM
ORDER by Judge John D Russell ; terminating attorney Ryan Christopher Alley ; granting39 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (clb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
39 39 motion Withdraw Attorney(s) Thu 02/20 10:42 AM
MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) Ryan C. Alley by Green Country Building Materials, LLC (Alley, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
38 38 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Fri 01/31 6:44 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge John D Russell (Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order) , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Discovery due by 9/26/2025, Dispositive Motions due by 10/3/2025, Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge John D Russell, Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge John D Russell, Jury Trial set for 2/9/2026 at 09:00 AM before Judge John D Russell) (clb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
37 37 minutes 17 - Scheduling Conference Held Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Fri 01/31 6:41 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Judge John D Russell: Scheduling Conference held on 1/31/2025 , case management plan and scheduling order to be entered separately , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): The parties will make initial disclosures on or before 2/7/25 ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 2/7/2025) (Court Reporter: Jennifer Golemboski) (clb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
36 36 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/30 10:19 AM
NOTICE Plaintiff's Designation of Lead Trial Counsel by Covington Specialty Insurance Company (Harmon, James)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/30 9:49 AM
NOTICE Designation of Lead Trial Counsel by Clifton Hanson (Smolen, Donald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/29 1:36 PM
NOTICE Defendant Green Country Building Materials, LLC's Designation of Lead Trial Counsel by Green Country Building Materials, LLC (Edmonds, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
33 33 order 02 - Minute Order Ruling on Motion to be Excused from Hearing Tue 01/28 3:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge John D Russell : Defendant Hanson's motion to excuse lead counsel from scheduling conference, Dkt. 32 , is granted on the condition that substitute counsel can execute a scheduling order for the case. Additionally, substitute counsel are reminded that the scheduling conference is a Teams videoconference, and shall have the appropriate sign on information ; granting32 Motion to be Excused from Hearing (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (clb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Excused from Hearing Tue 01/28 12:39 PM
MOTION to be Excused from the Status/Scheduling Conference set on 01/31/2025 by Clifton Hanson (Smolen, Donald)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 01/28 12:27 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Michael Fatigante on behalf of Clifton Hanson [Note: Attorney James Michael Fatigante added to party Clifton Hanson(pty:dft).] (Fatigante, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
30 30 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Wed 01/15 11:48 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge John D Russell : this matter is set for a status and scheduling conference via Teams videoconference on 1/31/25 at 10:30 a.m. A case management plan and scheduling order will be sent to the parties via email , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2025 at 10:30 AM before Judge John D Russell) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (clb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
29 29 order 02 - Minute Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Ruling on Motion to Dismiss Wed 01/15 10:13 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge John D Russell : upon filing of the Amended Complaint, Dkt. 15 , defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Join Indispensable Party, Dkt. 10 , is found moot ; finding as moot10 Motion to Dismiss Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (clb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 15 Amended Complaint,
Monday, November 04, 2024
order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Mon 11/04 9:17 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Clifton Hanson to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (mm, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
27 27 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Thu 10/31 11:05 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Clifton Hanson (Saint, Mathew)
Related: [-]
26 26 respoth Answer Thu 10/31 11:04 AM
ANSWER Related [+] by Clifton Hanson (Saint, Mathew)
Related: [-] 15 Amended Complaint,
25 25 notice Appearance - Attorney Thu 10/31 11:03 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mathew Scott Saint on behalf of Clifton Hanson [Note: Attorney Mathew Scott Saint added to party Clifton Hanson(pty:dft).] (Saint, Mathew)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Appearance - Attorney Thu 10/31 11:02 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Franklin Smith on behalf of Clifton Hanson [Note: Attorney Michael Franklin Smith added to party Clifton Hanson(pty:dft).] (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Appearance - Attorney Thu 10/31 11:00 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Donald Eugene Smolen, II on behalf of Clifton Hanson [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Clifton Hanson(pty:dft).] (Smolen, Donald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
22 22 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/15 1:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Clifton Hanson Related [+] by Covington Specialty Insurance Company (Olsson, Brently)
Related: [-] 15 Amended Complaint,
Thursday, July 25, 2024
21 21 respoth Answer Thu 07/25 6:57 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand Related [+] by Green Country Building Materials, LLC (Edmonds, James)
Related: [-] 15 Amended Complaint,
Monday, July 22, 2024
20 20 service Summons Issued Mon 07/22 4:42 PM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Clifton Hanson (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Appearance - Attorney Mon 07/22 3:14 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Richard Harmon on behalf of Covington Specialty Insurance Company [Note: Attorney James Richard Harmon added to party Covington Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla).] (Harmon, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
order 02 - Minute Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Fri 07/19 1:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge John D Russell : Counsel are directed to provide a redline, corrected case caption which includes ALL parties to the Court's ECF Intake email: CM-ECFIntake_OKND@oknd.uscourts.gov. Counsel are further directed to use the corrected case style on all future filings. Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (clb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 15 Amended Complaint,
Thursday, July 11, 2024
16 16 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Thu 07/11 3:41 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent Alleghany Corporation, Corporate Parent RSUI Group, Inc. for Covington Specialty Insurance Company) by Covington Specialty Insurance Company (Jody, Stasney)
Related: [-]
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 07/11 3:34 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Green Country Building Materials, LLC and Defendant Clifton Hanson Related [+] by Covington Specialty Insurance Company [Note: Attorney Stasney Jody added to party Covington Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla).] (Jody, Stasney)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,
order 02 - Minute Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Thu 07/11 4:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge John D Russell : pursuant to Rule 1.b. of Judge Russell's Individual Rules of Practice for Civil Cases, counsel are instructed to provide a redline copy of the document filed at Dkt. 15. Said copy should be submitted to the ECF Intake email: CM-ECFIntake_OKND@oknd.uscourts.gov. Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (clb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 15 Amended Complaint,
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Tue 06/25 11:24 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Green Country Building Materials, LLC to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Mon 06/24 10:13 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Green Country Building Materials, LLC (Edmonds, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
12 12 notice Appearance - Attorney Fri 06/21 12:02 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan Christopher Alley on behalf of Green Country Building Materials, LLC [Note: Attorney Ryan Christopher Alley added to party Green Country Building Materials, LLC(pty:dft).] (Alley, Ryan)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Appearance - Attorney Fri 06/21 11:37 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Newton Edmonds on behalf of Green Country Building Materials, LLC (Edmonds, James)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss Fri 06/21 11:32 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join Indispensable Party or Alternatively Join Necessary Party by Green Country Building Materials, LLC [Note: Attorney James Newton Edmonds added to party Green Country Building Materials, LLC(pty:dft).] (Edmonds, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/17 8:51 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Green Country Building Materials, LLC Related [+] by Covington Specialty Insurance Company (Olsson, Brently)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,
Friday, May 24, 2024
order 02 - Minute Order Fri 05/24 8:59 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge John D Russell : the Complaint was filed by counsel who have neither entered an appearance nor requested admission from this Court. Counsel are directed to file an entry of appearance and/or request admission to this Court. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (clb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
order 02 - Minute Order Case - Assigned to District Judge (declination of consent only) Case - Number Changed Thu 05/23 9:09 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , assigning this case to a district judge. Assigning case to District Judge John D Russell and Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne, changing case number to 24-cv-00201-JDR-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 05/01 3:31 PM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Green Country Building Materials, LLC (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
5 5 order 15 - Notice of Assignment of Case to MJ Wed 05/01 3:26 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Covington Specialty Insurance Company to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 05/01 1:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Covington Specialty Insurance Company (Olsson, Brently)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Appearance - Attorney Wed 05/01 1:04 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brently C Olsson on behalf of Covington Specialty Insurance Company (Olsson, Brently)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/01 1:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Covington Specialty Insurance Company (paid $405 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2998127) by Covington Specialty Insurance Company (With attachments) (Olsson, Brently)
Related: [-]
order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Wed 05/01 3:26 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Covington Specialty Insurance Company to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]