Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert W Schroeder, III
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:24-cv-00300
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 01, 2024
Terminated:Sep 09, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 28, 2024 3:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Arashi Vision Inc. dba Insta360
Plaintiff
DigiMedia Tech, LLC
Represented By
Cortney Alexander
Kent & Risley Llc - Alpharett
contact info


Docket last updated: 17 minutes ago
Monday, September 09, 2024
8 8 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 09/09 9:40 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (NKL)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 09/09 9:38 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/8/2024. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 09/05 12:48 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DigiMedia Tech, LLC(Alexander, Cortney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, June 10, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 06/10 3:49 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DigiMedia Tech, LLC. Arashi Vision Inc. dba Insta360 waiver sent on 6/7/2024, answer due 9/5/2024. (Alexander, Cortney)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 05/01 3:40 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Arashi Vision Inc. dba Insta360 c/o ARASHI VISION (U.S.) LLC (general manager) c/o Jingkang Liu Related [+]. (NKL)
Related: [-] g'd agent
3 3 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 05/01 3:27 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by DigiMedia Tech, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Brainbox Innovations, LLC for DigiMedia Tech, LLC. (Alexander, Cortney)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Wed 05/01 3:25 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Alexander, Cortney)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/01 3:23 PM
COMPLAINT against Arashi Vision Inc. dba Insta360 ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10116514.), filed by DigiMedia Tech, LLC.(Alexander, Cortney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 6,567,086,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - US Patent No. 6,741,250,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - US Patent No. 7,715,476,
Att: 4 9 pgs Exhibit D - Claim Chart re USP 6,567,086,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Claim Chart re USP 6,741,250,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Claim Chart re USP 7,715,476,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - PTO Presentation
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/01 3:33 PM
Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (NKL)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Wed 05/01 3:34 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (NKL)
Related: [-]