Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-00693

Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Eddward P Ballinger Jr
Case #: 2:24-ap-00080
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Michael Pinder, Defendant
18420 WEST SOLANO DRIVE
LITCHFIELD PARK, AZ 85340
Represented By
Michael Pinder
contact info
Plaintiff
Inland Empire Builders, Inc.
Sacks Tierney, P.A. c/o James Samuelson 4250 N. Drinkwater Blvd., 4th Floor
Scottsdale, AZ 85251
Represented By
JAMES S SAMUELSON
Sacks Tierney P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Avari LLC
Sacks Tierney, P.A. c/o James Samuelson 4250 N. Drinkwater Blvd., 4th Floor
Scottsdale, AZ 85251
Represented By
JAMES S SAMUELSON
Sacks Tierney P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM MST
Monday, March 03, 2025
22 22 order oGranting Mon 03/03 2:21 PM
ORDER Extending Extending Response Deadline signed on 3/3/2025 Related [+] . (RIV)
Related: [-] 20 Stipulation
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
21 21 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Wed 02/26 10:28 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Michael Pinder Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 20 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
20 20 other Stipulation Wed 02/26 10:27 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Response (Fifth) filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Avari LLC, Inland Empire Builders, Inc., Michael Pinder. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
19 19 order oApproving Tue 12/17 1:26 PM
ORDER Extending Response Deadline signed on 12/17/2024 Related [+] . (SJF)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation
Friday, December 13, 2024
18 18 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Fri 12/13 11:22 AM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Michael Pinder Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
17 17 other Stipulation Fri 12/13 11:21 AM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint (Fourth) filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Avari LLC, Inland Empire Builders, Inc., Michael Pinder. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
16 16 order oAllowing Thu 09/26 11:04 AM
ORDER Extending Deadline signed on 9/26/2024 Related [+] . (SJF)
Related: [-] 13 Stipulation
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
15 15 order oSubstitute Attorney Wed 09/25 12:07 PM
ORDER Granting Motion to Substitute Attorney terminating JAMES S SAMUELSON, Related [+] signed on 9/25/2024 . (SJF)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
14 14 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Tue 09/24 9:01 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Michael Pinder Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 13 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
13 13 other Stipulation Tue 09/24 8:59 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Response (Third) filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Avari LLC, Inland Empire Builders, Inc., Michael Pinder. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
12 12 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Thu 09/19 12:01 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by J. HENK TAYLOR of Warner Angle Hallam Jackson & Formanek, PLC on behalf of Avari LLC, Inland Empire Builders, Inc. Related [+]. (TAYLOR, J.)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Substitute Attorney
11 11 motion Substitute Attorney (Motion to) Thu 09/19 11:58 AM
Motion to Substitute Attorney filed by J. HENK TAYLOR of Warner Angle Hallam Jackson & Formanek, PLC on behalf of Avari LLC, Inland Empire Builders, Inc.. (TAYLOR, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
10 10 order oApproving Wed 08/21 1:40 PM
ORDER Extending Response Deadline signed on 8/21/2024 Related [+] . (SJF)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation
Monday, July 15, 2024
9 9 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Mon 07/15 6:23 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Michael Pinder Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
8 8 other Stipulation Mon 07/15 6:21 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Response (Second) filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Inland Empire Builders, Inc., Michael Pinder. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
7 7 order oGranting Tue 06/18 1:11 PM
ORDER Extending Response Deadline signed on 6/18/2024 Related [+] . (WES)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation
Thursday, June 06, 2024
6 6 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Thu 06/06 10:30 AM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Michael Pinder Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
5 5 other Stipulation Thu 06/06 10:29 AM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Response filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Avari LLC, Inland Empire Builders, Inc., Michael Pinder. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
4 4 other Certificate of Service Tue 05/07 12:54 PM
Certificate of Service filed by JAMES S SAMUELSON of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of Avari LLC, Inland Empire Builders, Inc.. Related [+] (SAMUELSON, JAMES)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Summons Issued
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued (Form) Wed 05/01 7:35 AM
Summons Issued . (SKG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
2 2 cmp Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/30 2:13 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons filed by JAMES S SAMUELSON of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of Avari LLC, Inland Empire Builders, Inc.. (SAMUELSON, JAMES)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/30 2:08 PM
Adversary case 2:24-ap-00080. Complaint (350.00 fee) against Michael Pinder filed by JAMES S SAMUELSON of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of Inland Empire Builders, Inc., Avari LLC Nature of Suit: 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud) 67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny) 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury) // Plaintiffs' Complaint Against Lord Pindernation . (SAMUELSON, JAMES)
Related: [-]