Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:23-bk-32834

Oregon Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Teresa H Pearson
Case #: 3:24-ap-03016
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2024
Terminated:Oct 08, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Magno LLC, an Oregon limited liability company
Represented By
Magno LLC
contact info
Defendant
Pacific West Bank
Represented By
Pacific West Bank
contact info
Defendant
Magno-Humphries Inc., an Oregon corporation
Represented By
Magno-Humphries Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Finishing First, Inc., an Oregon corporation
Represented By
Finishing First, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Tigard WinSupply Co, a Delaware corporation
Represented By
Tigard WinSupply Co
contact info
Defendant
Kenneth S Eiler, in his capacity as the Chapter 11 trustee
Represented By
Kenneth S Eiler
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey D. Bowden
POB 231297
Tigard, OR 97281
Represented By
BRUCE H ORR
Wyse Kadish LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Tue 10/08 10:07 AM
Adversary Case 3:24-ap-3016 Closed (lew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Wed 09/25 9:09 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:37 Judgment (dcm). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
37 37 order Judgment Mon 09/23 8:46 AM
Judgment (dcm)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Fri 09/13 9:07 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:35 Judgment Against Plaintiff (lew). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
35 35 order Judgment Wed 09/11 3:28 PM
Judgment Against Plaintiff (lew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Thu 09/05 9:10 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:33 Notice of Proposed Dismissal for failure to lodge a proposed judgment. Effective Within 21 Days. Last Date to Comply 9/24/2024. (bls). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Proposed Dismissal (AP) Tue 09/03 11:56 AM
Notice of Proposed Dismissal for failure to lodge a proposed judgment. Effective Within 21 Days. Last Date to Comply 9/24/2024. (bls)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 01, 2024
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Sun 09/01 9:09 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:30 Order Granting21 Motion For Summary Judgment.,22 Motion to Join/for Joinder of Subchapter V Trustee to Defendant Magno L.L.C.'s Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Kenneth S Eiler,23 Motion to Join/for Joinder filed by Defendant Finishing First, Inc., Defendant Tigard WinSupply Co,24 Motion to Join/for Joinder filed by Defendant Pacific West Bank. (lew). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Sun 09/01 9:09 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:29 Order Re:20 Motion to Dismiss Cause of Action against Defendant Magno-Humphries Inc. filed by Defendant Magno-Humphries Inc. (lew). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Joinder Fri 08/30 3:14 PM
Order Granting21 Motion For Summary Judgment.,22 Motion to Join/for Joinder of Subchapter V Trustee to Defendant Magno L.L.C.'s Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Kenneth S Eiler,23 Motion to Join/for Joinder filed by Defendant Finishing First, Inc., Defendant Tigard WinSupply Co,24 Motion to Join/for Joinder filed by Defendant Pacific West Bank. (lew)
Related: [-]
29 29 2 pgs order Order Dismissing (e.g., Cause of Action, Appeal) Fri 08/30 2:55 PM
Order Re:20 Motion to Dismiss Cause of Action against Defendant Magno-Humphries Inc. filed by Defendant Magno-Humphries Inc. (lew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
28 28 misc Request for Audio Recording of Court Proceeding Wed 07/03 8:30 AM
Request for Audio of Court Proceeding held on 06/13/2024 at 10:30 am. Recording format: Windows Media Player[Version 7.0 or Higher]. $34 Filing Fee Paid. Filed By Plaintiff Jeffrey D. Bowden (ORR, BRUCE)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 07/03 8:31 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Request for Audio Recording of Court Proceeding([LINK 24-03016 thp] ) [misc,cdreq] ( 34.00). Receipt Number A21752636. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc# 28
Saturday, June 22, 2024
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Sat 06/22 9:12 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:26 Scheduling Order re:20 Motion to Dismiss Cause of Action against Defendant Magno-Humphries Inc. Filed by Defendant Magno-Humphries Inc. (NEUMAN, RAIFE),21 Motion For Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support, and Supporting Document(s). Filed by Defendant Magno LLC (SCHOEN, AVA),22 Motion to Join/for Joinder of Subchapter V Trustee to Defendant Magno L.L.C.'s Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant Kenneth S Eiler Re:21 Motion For Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support, and Supporting Document(s). filed by Counter-Claimant Magno LLC, Defendant Magno LLC (CRISWELL, DAVID),23 Motion to Join/for Joinder Filed by Finishing First, Inc., Tigard WinSupply Co Re:21 Motion For Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support, and Supporting Document(s). filed by Counter-Claimant Magno LLC, Defendant Magno LLC (LEVINE, HOWARD),24 Motion to Join/for Joinder Filed by Defendant Pacific West Bank Re:21 Motion For Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support, and Supporting Document(s). filed by Counter-Claimant Magno LLC, Defendant Magno LLC (AYRES, JASON) (lew). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
26 26 order Scheduling Order Thu 06/20 12:36 PM
Scheduling Order re:20 Motion to Dismiss Cause of Action against Defendant Magno-Humphries Inc. Filed by Defendant Magno-Humphries Inc. (NEUMAN, RAIFE),21 Motion For Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support, and Supporting Document(s). Filed by Defendant Magno LLC (SCHOEN, AVA),22 Motion to Join/for Joinder of Subchapter V Trustee to Defendant Magno L.L.C.'s Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant Kenneth S Eiler Re:21 Motion For Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support, and Supporting Document(s). filed by Counter-Claimant Magno LLC, Defendant Magno LLC (CRISWELL, DAVID),23 Motion to Join/for Joinder Filed by Finishing First, Inc., Tigard WinSupply Co Re:21 Motion For Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support, and Supporting Document(s). filed by Counter-Claimant Magno LLC, Defendant Magno LLC (LEVINE, HOWARD),24 Motion to Join/for Joinder Filed by Defendant Pacific West Bank Re:21 Motion For Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support, and Supporting Document(s). filed by Counter-Claimant Magno LLC, Defendant Magno LLC (AYRES, JASON) (lew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
25 25 court CHAP ME Pretrial Hearing Continued/Held - CHAP Fri 06/14 9:12 AM
Pretrial Hearing Held. (bls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
24 24 motion Join/Joinder Tue 06/11 11:31 AM
Motion to Join/for Joinder Filed by Defendant Pacific West Bank Re:21 Motion For Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support, and Supporting Document(s). filed by Counter-Claimant Magno LLC, Defendant Magno LLC (AYRES, JASON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
23 23 motion Join/Joinder Thu 06/06 11:33 AM
Motion to Join/for Joinder Filed by Finishing First, Inc., Tigard WinSupply Co Re:21 Motion For Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support, and Supporting Document(s). filed by Counter-Claimant Magno LLC, Defendant Magno LLC (LEVINE, HOWARD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
22 22 motion Join/Joinder Wed 06/05 11:22 AM
Motion to Join/for Joinder of Subchapter V Trustee to Defendant Magno L.L.C.'s Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant Kenneth S Eiler Re:21 Motion For Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support, and Supporting Document(s). filed by Counter-Claimant Magno LLC, Defendant Magno LLC (CRISWELL, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
21 21 motion Summary Judgment Tue 06/04 2:52 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support, and Supporting Document(s). Filed by Defendant Magno LLC (SCHOEN, AVA)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
20 20 motion Dismiss (e.g., Cause of Action, Appeal) Fri 05/31 10:00 PM
Motion to Dismiss Cause of Action against Defendant Magno-Humphries Inc. Filed by Defendant Magno-Humphries Inc. (NEUMAN, RAIFE)
Related: [-]
19 19 answer Response Fri 05/31 4:07 PM
Response Filed by Defendant Magno-Humphries Inc. Re:1 Adversary case 24-03016 Complaint by Jeffrey D. Bowden against Magno LLC, Pacific West Bank, Magno-Humphries Inc., Finishing First, Tigard WinSupply Co. $350 Filing Fee. Nature of Suit:(91 (Declaratory judgment); (21 Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property) (ORR, BRUCE) Modified on 4/30/2024 (lew). Updated docket text re: additional nature of suit (21). (NEUMAN, RAIFE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/30 5:46 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Pacific West Bank (AYRES, JASON)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/30 2:20 PM
First Amended Certificate of Service Re:11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Filed By Defendant Magno LLC, Counter-Claimant Magno LLC (CONWAY, TIMOTHY)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/30 11:32 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Kenneth S Eiler (CRISWELL, DAVID)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/30 10:55 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Tigard WinSupply Co (LEVINE, HOWARD)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/30 10:54 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Finishing First, Inc. (LEVINE, HOWARD)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Response Thu 05/30 10:23 AM
Superseded by Doc #15 Response Filed by Defendant Tigard WinSupply Co Re:1 Adversary case 24-03016 Complaint by Jeffrey D. Bowden against Magno LLC, Pacific West Bank, Magno-Humphries Inc., Finishing First, Tigard WinSupply Co. $350 Filing Fee. Nature of Suit:(91 (Declaratory judgment); (21 Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property) (ORR, BRUCE) Modified on 4/30/2024 (lew). Updated docket text re: additional nature of suit (21). (LEVINE, HOWARD) Modified on 5/30/2024 (lew).
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Response Thu 05/30 10:20 AM
Superseded by Doc #14 Response Filed by Defendant Finishing First, Inc. Re:1 Adversary case 24-03016 Complaint by Jeffrey D. Bowden against Magno LLC, Pacific West Bank, Magno-Humphries Inc., Finishing First, Tigard WinSupply Co. $350 Filing Fee. Nature of Suit:(91 (Declaratory judgment); (21 Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property) (ORR, BRUCE) Modified on 4/30/2024 (lew). Updated docket text re: additional nature of suit (21). (LEVINE, HOWARD) Modified on 5/30/2024 (lew).
Related: [-]
11 11 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Thu 05/30 9:01 AM
Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Magno LLC against Jeffrey D. Bowden Filed by Magno LLC (SCHOEN, AVA)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
10 10 notice Notice Fri 05/24 2:02 PM
Notice Appearance and Request for Special Notice to Attorneys Tara Schleicher and Jason Ayres for Pacific West Bank. Filed By Defendant Pacific West Bank (AYRES, JASON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance/Representation Thu 05/23 8:25 AM
Text-only Entry: Notice of Appearance/Representation Filed By Defendant Tigard WinSupply Co (LEVINE, HOWARD)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed [May use LBF 305 12/1/19] Fri 05/03 1:04 PM
Summons Served on Tigard WinSupply Co 5/2/2024. (ORR, BRUCE)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed [May use LBF 305 12/1/19] Fri 05/03 1:03 PM
Summons Served on Pacific West Bank 5/2/2024. (ORR, BRUCE)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed [May use LBF 305 12/1/19] Fri 05/03 1:02 PM
Summons Served on Magno-Humphries Inc. 5/2/2024. (ORR, BRUCE)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed [May use LBF 305 12/1/19] Fri 05/03 1:01 PM
Summons Served on Magno LLC 5/2/2024. (ORR, BRUCE)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed [May use LBF 305 12/1/19] Fri 05/03 1:00 PM
Summons Served on Finishing First, Inc. 5/2/2024. (ORR, BRUCE)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed [May use LBF 305 12/1/19] Fri 05/03 12:59 PM
Summons Served on Kenneth S Eiler 5/2/2024. (ORR, BRUCE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 04/30 2:12 PM
Summons Issued for service on Kenneth S Eiler ; Finishing First, Inc. ; Magno LLC ; Magno-Humphries Inc. ; Pacific West Bank ; Tigard WinSupply Co1 Complaint Pretrial Hearing Set for 6/13/2024 at 10:30 AM in/by Telephone Hearing. (lew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/30 1:07 PM
Adversary case 24-03016 Complaint by Jeffrey D. Bowden against Magno LLC, Pacific West Bank, Magno-Humphries Inc., Finishing First, Tigard WinSupply Co. $350 Filing Fee. Nature of Suit:(91 (Declaratory judgment); (21 Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property) (ORR, BRUCE) Modified on 4/30/2024 (lew). Updated docket text re: additional nature of suit (21).
Related: [-]