Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Kathleen M Williams
Referred: Jonathan Goodman
Case #: 1:24-cv-21695
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:0002 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:May 01, 2024
Terminated:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: Monday Oct 28, 2024 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Worldwide Flight Services, Inc.
a New York for profit corporation JFK Airport 151 E. Hangar Rd. Suite 361
Jamaica, NY 11430
Represented By
Matthew David Stefany
Allen, Norton And Blue, P.A.
contact info
Gerard Clodomir
Womble Bond Dickinson
contact info
John Pueschel
Womble Bond Dickinson
contact info
Mediator
Marlene Quintana
GrayRobinson P.A. 333 S.E. 2nd Avenue Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131
Plaintiff
Marlon Batres
an individual Ravindran Law Firm PLLC 2 S. Biscayne Blvd.
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Iva Uroic Ravindran
Ravindran Law Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
34 34 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Thu 04/10 10:11 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Marlon Batres (Ravindran, Iva)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
33 33 order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Tue 03/11 5:15 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. THIS MATTER is before the Court on the notice indicating that the Parties have reached a settlement. (DE32 .) Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that on or before April 10, 2025 , the Parties shall file a joint stipulation of dismissal. If the Parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction beyond the filing of their joint stipulation, they are advised that they must file the settlement agreement for review and any stipulation must comply with the Eleventh Circuit's holding in Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC , 677 F.3d 1272 (11th Cir. 2012). Otherwise, the dismissal of this matter is effective and self-executing upon the filing of the Parties' joint stipulation of dismissal. Id. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT . All hearings, trial settings, and deadlines are CANCELED . This case is CLOSED for administrative purposes. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 3/11/2025. (cgd)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Tue 03/11 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Marlon Batres (Ravindran, Iva)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
31 31 adr Mediation Report Tue 02/11 8:57 AM
FINAL MEDIATION REPORT held before Mediator Marlene Quintana. Prepared by: Marlene Quintana. Filed by Marlene Quintana. Disposition: Case did not settle. Mediation held/partially held via video-conference. (Quintana, Marlene)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
30 30 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Fri 02/07 10:13 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re29 Notice of Attorney Appearance. Attorney Did Not Associate Themselves ; ERROR - Filing attorney neglected to associate themselves to the proper filer(s)/case. The Clerk has added the attorney to the proper filer(s)/case. It is not necessary to refile this document. Future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures and Local Rules by filing a Notice of Attorney Appearance and linking themselves to the proper filer(s)/case. (wce)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 02/07 9:48 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Arun Gopal Ravindran on behalf of Marlon Batres (Ravindran, Arun)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
28 28 order Order Striking Mon 02/03 3:41 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER striking27 NOTICE of Compliance with Plaintiff's Subpoena for Documents by DSV Air & Sea Inc. for violating Local Rule 26.1(b). Counsel is reminded that both Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(d) and Local Rule 26.1(b) specifically prohibit the practice of filing discovery materials, including initial and expert disclosures, discovery requests, responses, and notices with the Court unless the materials are to be used in the proceeding or the Court orders otherwise. Such filings serve no purpose and only act to clutter the docket. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 2/3/2025. (mkr)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Compliance Mon 02/03 3:24 PM
STRICKEN NOTICE of Compliance With Plaintiff's Subpoena for Documents by DSV Air & Sea Inc.. Attorney Andrew Robert Spector added to party DSV Air & Sea Inc.(pty:res). (Spector, Andrew) Modified Text per DE 28 on 2/3/2025 (wce)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
26 26 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 11/14 12:50 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 11/14/2024. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
25 25 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 11/13 1:57 PM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Order by Worldwide Flight Services, Inc..(Stefany, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
24 24 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Wed 08/21 9:30 AM
Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Joint Notice of Mediation. Selected/Added Marlene Quintana as Mediator. (Ravindran, Iva)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
23 23 trial Witness List Mon 08/05 4:55 PM
Witness List by Marlon Batres.. (Ravindran, Iva)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
22 22 order Scheduling Order Mon 07/22 9:21 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Calendar Call set for 7/22/2025 11:00 AM before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Jury Trial set for 7/28/2025 in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
21 21 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Thu 07/18 1:38 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Marlon Batres(Ravindran, Iva)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Schedule Jointly Proposed by the Parties
Monday, July 01, 2024
20 20 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/01 10:13 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting16 Defendant's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for AttorneyJohn Pueschel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 7/1/2024. (md00)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/01 10:11 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting15 Defendant's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Gerard Clodomir. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 7/1/2024. (md00)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
18 18 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/28 5:36 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Worldwide Flight Services, Inc. (Stefany, Matthew)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 06/28 5:26 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Worldwide Flight Services, Inc.. (Stefany, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Thu 06/27 11:36 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John Pueschel. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17638037 by Worldwide Flight Services, Inc.. Responses due by 7/11/2024.(Stefany, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certification of John Pueschel,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Thu 06/27 11:34 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gerard Clodomir. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17638013 by Worldwide Flight Services, Inc.. Responses due by 7/11/2024.(Stefany, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certification of Gerard Clodomir,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Friday, June 14, 2024
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Fri 06/14 1:54 PM
Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Worldwide Flight Services, Inc., filed by Marlon Batres.(Ravindran, Iva)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Stipulation Fri 06/14 11:59 AM
JOINT STIPULATION on Amendment of Plaintiff's1 Complaint by Marlon Batres (Ravindran, Iva) Modified text on 6/14/2024 (scn)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 06/07 4:09 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to1 Complaint by Worldwide Flight Services, Inc. The instant motion is unopposed and complies with Judge Williams' 48-hour rule. See Judge Williams' Court Practices and Procedures (available at the Court's website: https://www.flsd.uscourts.gov/content/judge-kathleen-m-williams). As noted in the motion, this is Defendant's second request for an extension of time. Defendant requests additional time so that the parties may attempt to narrow the claims in this action. The Undersigned finds good cause for the unopposed request. Accordingly, Defendant will have until June 25, 2024 to file on CM/ECF its response to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 6/7/2024. (mkr)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 06/07 1:52 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Worldwide Flight Services, Inc.. (Stefany, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
10 10 misc Statement Wed 06/05 1:52 PM
Statement of: Claim by Marlon Batres re5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other, (Ravindran, Iva)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
9 9 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 05/23 11:48 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 5/23/2024. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 05/22 2:50 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to1 Complaint by Worldwide Flight Services, Inc. The instant motion is unopposed and complies with Judge Williams' 48-hour rule. See Judge Williams' Court Practices and Procedures (available at the Court's website: https://www.flsd.uscourts.gov/content/judge-kathleen-m-williams). Accordingly, Defendant will have until June 11, 2024 to file on CM/ECF its response to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 5/22/2024. (mkr)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 05/22 2:27 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Worldwide Flight Services, Inc.. (Stefany, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 05/22 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew David Stefany on behalf of Worldwide Flight Services, Inc.. Attorney Matthew David Stefany added to party Worldwide Flight Services, Inc.(pty:dft). (Stefany, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
5 5 7 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Tue 05/21 11:45 AM
ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN FLSA CASES:Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules for the Southern District of Florida, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that all discovery disputes and non-dispositive pretrial motions are REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/21/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
4 4 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 05/09 1:53 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Marlon Batres. Worldwide Flight Services, Inc. served on 5/7/2024, response/answer due 5/28/2024. (Ravindran, Iva)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 05/02 8:44 AM
Summons Issued as to Worldwide Flight Services, Inc.. (pc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 05/02 8:41 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/01 5:15 PM
COMPLAINT Marlon Batres against Worldwide Flight Services, Inc.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17495819, filed by Marlon Batres.(Ravindran, Iva)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)