Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Allison D Burroughs
Case #: 1:24-cv-11168
Nature of Suit196 Contract - Franchise
Cause12:1730 Collection Under Contract Guaranty
Case Filed:May 01, 2024
Terminated:Aug 22, 2024
Case in other court:Middlesex Superior Court, 2481cv843
Last checked: Monday Oct 28, 2024 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Sarbjeet Sahota
Law Office of Carl Brugnoli PO Box 320530
Boston, MA 02132
Represented By
Carl A. Brugnoli
Law Office Of Carl Brugnoli
contact info
John J. Morgan
Barr & Morgan
contact info
Defendant
SKJ Properties VIII LLC
Represented By
Carl A. Brugnoli
Law Office Of Carl Brugnoli
contact info
John J. Morgan
Barr & Morgan
contact info
Plaintiff
Alliance Energy LLC
Saul Benowitz 81 Washington St. Suite 310
Salem, MA 01970
Represented By
Saul L. Benowitz
Saul Benowitz Attorney At Law
contact info
Raymond S. Ewer
Tennant & Ewer, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, August 22, 2024
21 21 misc Case file sent Thu 08/22 4:11 PM
Case file sent to Middlesex Superior Court. (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order of Remand to State Court Thu 08/22 3:57 PM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMAND to the State Court. (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Thu 08/22 3:48 PM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER ENTERED. On June 20, 2024, Plaintiff Alliance Energy LLC (?Plaintiff? or ?Alliance?) filed a motion to remand this case to state court. [ECF No.16 ]. Because Defendants failed to file an opposition within 14 days after the motion was served, in compliance with D. Mass. Local Rule 7.1(b)(2), the Court ordered Defendants to show cause by August 15, 2024, as to why this action should not be remanded. [ECF No. 18 ]. To date, Defendants have failed to comply with the Court?s order. For the reasons set forth below, Plaintiff?s unopposed motion is GRANTED . In the First Circuit, ?the citizenship of a limited liability company is determined by the citizenship of all of its members.? Pramco, LLC ex rel. CFSC Consortium, LLC v. San Juan Bay Marina, Inc. , 435 F.3d 51, 54 (1st Cir. 2006). Here, Alliance is wholly owned by Global Operating LLC, a Delaware limited liability company and Alliance?s sole member. [ECF No. 17 at 3]. The sole member of Global Operating LLC, in turn, is Global Partners LP, a master limited partnership. [ Id. ]. As of 2024, Global Partners LP had more than 500 individual unit owners residing in the State of New York, [ id. at 4], and it is therefore a citizen of New York. See Grynberg v. Kinder-Morgan Energy Partners, L.P. , 805 F.3d. 901, 904?05 (10th Cir. 2015). Accordingly, because Defendants are also citizens of New York, [ECF No. 2 ¶ 3], diversity is incomplete, and the Court remands this case to state court. (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
18 18 order Order To Show Cause Mon 08/05 9:10 AM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. On June 21, 2024, Plaintiff filed a motion to remand the present action to state court. [ECF Nos.16 ,17 ]. In accordance with Local Rule 7.1(b)(2), any opposition to Plaintiff?s motion should have been filed by July 5, 2024 . See D. Mass. Local Rule 7.1(b)(2) (2019) (?A party opposing a motion shall file an opposition within 14 days after the motion is served. . . .?). Accordingly, Defendants are hereby ORDERED to show cause, in writing, by August 15, 2024 , as to why this action should not be remanded to state court.(McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
17 17 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 06/21 10:34 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Alliance Energy LLC.(Ewer, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Matthew Spencer,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Raymond S. Ewer
Thursday, June 20, 2024
16 16 motion Remand to State Court Thu 06/20 6:32 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Alliance Energy LLC.(Ewer, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Matthew Spencer,
Att: 3 Affidavit of Raymond S. Ewer
15 15 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/20 6:27 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alliance Energy LLC identifying Corporate Parent Global Partners LP for Alliance Energy LLC.. (Ewer, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 05/24 9:44 AM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re13 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Indefinite to For plaintiff to file Motion to Remand. Motion GRANTED. Motion for remand or Rule 26(f) report due June 21, 2024. (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time Thu 05/23 2:13 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Indefinite to For plaintiff to file Motion to Remand by Alliance Energy LLC.(Ewer, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
12 12 order Order Mon 05/20 2:23 PM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The parties shall submit a joint proposed schedule by 6/3/24 and indicate whether they object to the court setting a schedule on the written submission. (Folan, Karen)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/17 6:18 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Including Affirmative Defenses by SKJ Properties VIII LLC, Sarbjeet Sahota.(Morgan, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/16 5:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Morgan on behalf of SKJ Properties VIII LLC, Sarbjeet Sahota (Morgan, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
9 9 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Fri 05/10 10:32 AM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John J. Morgan. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected. Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm] . A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
8 8 misc Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet Thu 05/02 4:11 PM
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Alliance Energy LLC. (Ewer, Raymond)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Thu 05/02 3:50 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Kelly, Danielle)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Case Assignment Thu 05/02 3:45 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Cowan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice - Other Thu 05/02 2:51 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Kelly, Danielle)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/02 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond S. Ewer on behalf of Alliance Energy LLC (Ewer, Raymond)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/02 2:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John J. Morgan Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10397808 by Carl SKJ Properties VIII LLC, Sarbjeet Sahota.(Brugnoli, Carl) (Kelly, Danielle). (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/2/2024) (Kelly, Danielle). Modified on 5/2/2024: Removed proposed order from main document (Kelly, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/2/2024) Text of Proposed Order
2 2 notice Notice of Removal Thu 05/02 1:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SKJ Properties VIII LLC, Sarbjeet Sahota ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10397579 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Brugnoli, Carl) Modified on 5/2/2024: corrected party name (Kelly, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Notice of Pending Motions,
Att: 3 Notice of Filing as Filed in Superior Court,
Att: 4 Certificate of Filing in Superior Court,
Att: 5 Summons and Return,
Att: 6 COMPLAINT
1 1 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/02 12:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A. Brugnoli on behalf of SKJ Properties VIII LLC, Sarbjeet Sahota (Brugnoli, Carl) Modified on 5/2/2024: corrected party name (Kelly, Danielle)
Related: [-]