State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al v. Chester Medical Services P.C.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Allyne R Ross |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03254 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | May 01, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jan 14, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 28, 2024 4:30 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chester Medical Services P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State Farm Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 14, 2025 | ||
25 | 25
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE voluntary dismissal with prejudice. ( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 1/14/2025 ) (RG) |
|
Monday, January 13, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Moroney, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, January 09, 2025 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 01/09 10:02 AM
ORDER: The parties reported that they had settled this case on December 4, 2024. ECF No.22 . The Court ordered the parties to file a stipulation discontinuing this matter by January 8, 2025. The parties request for a ten-day extension of time is granted. ECF No.23 . The parties shall file a stipulation discontinuing this action by January 23, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 1/9/2025. (NL) |
||
Wednesday, January 08, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Letter Joint Status by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Moroney, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, December 11, 2024 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 12/11 11:01 AM
ORDER: The parties report that they "have reached a settlement in principle pending client approval of a written settlement." ECF No.22 . The conference scheduled on December 17, 2024 is canceled. The Court commends the parties for their efforts to resolve this matter. The parties shall file a stipulation discontinuing this action by January 8, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 12/11/2024. (NL) |
||
Wednesday, December 04, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Letter Joint Status by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Moroney, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2024 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 12/03 4:59 PM
ORDER: The parties timely filed a status letter stating that they "have engaged in extensive settlement negotiations and have made progress." ECF No.21 . The parties also stated that "[i]f the matter is not settled in the next 10 days, the parties will update the Court on discovery status." Id. To date, nothing further has been filed on the docket. The Court shall hold a status conference in this matter on December 17, 2024 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. If the parties file a joint letter by December 11, 2024 that they have reached a settlement in principle, I will cancel the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 12/3/2024. (NL) |
||
Friday, November 15, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Letter Joint Status by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Moroney, Matthew) |
|
Monday, October 07, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER re:19 Letter, Resolves Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; Terminating13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction as moot. ( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 10/7/2024 ) (RG) |
|
Friday, October 04, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Letter Regarding Stipulation that Resolves Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Moroney, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2024 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 10/01 4:38 PM
ORDER: The parties timely file a joint status letter noting that defendant "has agreed to stipulate to the requested relief sought in [plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction]" and that "the parties have engaged in settlement discussions." ECF No.18 . The parties shall file another joint status letter by November 15, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 10/1/2024. (NL) |
||
Monday, September 30, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Letter Joint Status by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Moroney, Matthew) |
|
Friday, September 27, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Letter by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Moroney, Matthew) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Fri 09/06 3:48 PM
ORDER: The court has received plaintiffs' motion to stay and for a preliminary injunction. Defendant has until September 20, 2024 to serve opposition papers. Plaintiffs' reply papers, if any, shall be served no later than September 27, 2024. The fully briefed motion shall be filed in accordance with chambers' rules, including courtesy copies for chambers, no later than September 27, 2024. This schedule may be altered only with the permission of the court. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 9/6/2024. (AL) |
||
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() MEMORANDUM in Support re13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Stay filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Moroney, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
15 | 15
![]() DECLARATION re13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Stay by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Moroney, Matthew) |
|
14 | 14
![]() DECLARATION re13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Stay by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Moroney, Matthew) |
|
13 | 13
![]() MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Stay by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Moroney, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - Declined
Thu 09/05 5:12 PM
NOTICE to Assign District Judge: The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to a district judge. (NL) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Thu 09/05 5:21 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (BBM) |
||
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/14 1:47 PM
ORDER: The Court notes that plaintiff filed its amended complaint on July 30, 2024, ECF No.11 and defendant Chester Medical Services P.C. filed its answer on August 13, 2024. ECF No.12 . The parties shall file a status letter by September 30, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 8/14/2024. (NL) |
||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint, by Chester Medical Services P.C.. (Conroy, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chester Medical Services P.C., filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company. (Moroney, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 07/02 1:46 PM
ORDER: The Court held the initial conference in this matter on July 2, 2024. Attorney Matthew A. Moroney appeared on behalf of plaintiff and attorney Robert E.B. Hewitt, III appeared on behalf of defendant. The Court set the following deadlines: any motion to amend the complaint or join new parties shall be filed by August 2, 2024. Fed R. Civ. P. 16(b)(3)(A). Defendant shall respond to the amended complaint by August 20, 2024. The parties shall meet and confer and file any proposed confidentiality order by August 20, 2024. The parties shall complete fact discovery by January 10, 2025. Should the parties choose to do so, they can consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate pursuant to the Pilot Program under Administrative Order 2023-23." If they consent, the parties shall file the consent form by August 1, 2024. The form is available here: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. If no consent form is filed by August 1, 2024, I shall direct the Clerk of Court to assign this matter to a District Judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 7/2/2024. (NL) |
||
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Tue 07/02 1:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom:Initial Conference Hearing held on 7/2/2024. (FTR Log #10:31-11:16.) (NL) |
||
Thursday, June 13, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Thu 06/13 5:04 PM
ORDER: Plaintiffs request, with defendant's consent, a first adjournment of the initial conference scheduled on June 18, 2024. ECF No.10 . The request is granted. The Court shall hold the initial conference in this matter on July 2, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least seventy-two (72) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 6/13/2024. (NL) |
||
Wednesday, June 12, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() MOTION to Adjourn Conference Request for an Adjournment for Conference Scheduled on June 18,2024 by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Moroney, Matthew) |
|
9 | 9
![]() REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Moroney, Matthew) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2024 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 05/24 2:22 PM
ORDER: The Court shall hold the initial conference in plaintiffs' declaratory judgment action on June 18, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file their Rule 26(f) Meeting Report with the Court by June 11, 2024. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least seventy-two (72) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/24/2024. (VP) |
||
Thursday, May 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. B. Hewitt, III on behalf of Chester Medical Services P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Hewitt, Robert) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Conroy on behalf of Chester Medical Services P.C. (notification declined or already on case) (Conroy, Matthew) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chester Medical Services P.C. (Conroy, Matthew) |
|
5 | 5
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Chester Medical Services P.C.. (Conroy, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (SDM) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to Chester Medical Services P.C.. (SDM) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Chester Medical Services P.C. filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17828916 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire And Casualty Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company. (Moroney, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |