Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Thomas L Parker
Referred: Annie T Christoff
Case #: 2:24-cv-02285
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:May 01, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 11:33 PM CST
Defendant
Apperson Crump, PLC
Defendant
Estate of John Bellisomi
Defendant
Estate of Louis Lenti
Defendant
Timothy Ginski
Defendant
Anthony Luraschi
Defendant
Elevia Luraschi
Defendant
Eugene Ori
Defendant
Jean Marie Ori
Defendant
Richard W. Periotti
Plaintiff
Rheta Negrete-Neal
6305 Highland Knolls Drive
Bakersfield, CA 93306


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
37 37 misc Mail Returned Tue 04/29 10:17 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Rheta Negrete-Neal. (jae)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
36 36 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/28 8:06 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (proposed order submitted) ,35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Rheta Negrete-Neal. (jae)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
35 35 2 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 04/11 12:33 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Apperson Crump, PLC.(Vescovo, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum
Thursday, April 10, 2025
34 34 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/10 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W. Vescovo on behalf of Apperson Crump, PLC (Vescovo, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
33 33 8 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/07 3:32 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (proposed order submitted) by Jean Marie Ori. (Prueter, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
32 32 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 04/04 3:05 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING29 SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Though the Motion's Certificate of Consultation does not reflect whether the Motion is opposed, in the interest of judicial economy, the Court will consider the Motion now. For good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant Apperson Crump's deadline to respond to the Complaint is now April 11, 2025. No further extensions of time will be permitted absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on 04/04/2025. (jad)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/04 11:00 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re25 MOTION MOTION FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFFS TO SERVE DEFENDANTS GINSKI AND PIEROTTI BY PUBLICATION filed by Timothy Ginski. (Ray, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
30 30 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/04 10:58 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re24 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Timothy Ginski.(Ray, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Timothy Ginski
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/02 1:27 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed order submitted by Apperson Crump, PLC. (Smith, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
28 28 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 03/25 7:11 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING27 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Though the Motion's Certificate of Consultation does not reflect whether the Motion is opposed, in the interest of judicial economy, the Court will consider the Motion now. For good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant Apperson Crump's deadline to respond to the Complaint is now April 2, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on 03/25/2025. (jad)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
27 27 4 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 03/24 3:55 PM
Proposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Apperson Crump, PLC. (Smith, Bruce)
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 03/24 12:08 PM
Summons Issued as to Estate of John Bellisomi. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (cmm)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/24 12:07 PM
MOTION FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFFS TO SERVE DEFENDANTS GINSKI AND PIEROTTI BY PUBLICATION by Rheta Negrete-Neal. (cmm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/24 7:58 AM
PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE in Opposition re21 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Rheta Negrete-Neal. (cmm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
23 23 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/21 8:24 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rheta Negrete-Neal as to Estate of Louis Lenti and Jean Marie Ori. (mf)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
22 22 6 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 03/03 4:21 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SERVICE OF PROCESS ON THE UNSERVED DEFENDANTS AND DIRECTING APPERSON CRUMP TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. Responses due by 03/24/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on 03/03/2025. (jad)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
21 21 2 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 02/17 4:09 PM
First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Timothy Ginski.(Ray, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Tim Ginski,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Serena Gonzales
Friday, February 07, 2025
20 20 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 02/07 6:59 AM
First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Elevia Luraschi. (Whitlock, Derek)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
19 19 4 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 01/31 12:20 PM
First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Anthony Luraschi. (Whitlock, Derek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 01/29 11:49 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING15 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Though the Motion's Certificate of Consultation does not reflect whether the Motion is opposed, in the interest of judicial economy, the Court will consider the Motion now. For good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant Timothy Ginski's deadline to respond to the Complaint is now February 17, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on 01/29/2025. (jad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
17 17 service Certificate of Service Tue 01/28 1:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rheta Negrete-Neal on Richard Pieriotti (jae)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
16 16 service Certificate of Service Mon 01/27 3:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rheta Negrete-Neal service on Elevia Luraschi. (jae)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 01/27 3:02 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Pro Se Complaint proposed order submitted by Timothy Ginski. (Ray, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/27 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Conner Ray on behalf of Timothy Ginski (Ray, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
13 13 service Certificate of Service Tue 01/14 3:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rheta Negrete-Neal (jae)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
12 12 service Certificate of Service Tue 01/07 12:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rheta Negrete-Neal on Apperson Crump. (jae)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
11 11 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 12/12 12:03 PM
ORDER GRANTING FINAL EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS. Proof of Service due by 01/09/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on 12/12/2024. (jad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Thu 12/05 3:39 PM
Summons Issued as to Apperson Crump, PLC, Estate of John Bellisomi, Estate of Louis Lenti, Timothy Ginski, Anthony Luraschi, Elevia Luraschi, Eugene Ori. The filer was emailed the issued summons for service.(jae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 summons,
Att: 2 summons,
Att: 3 summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 summons,
Att: 6 summons
Thursday, October 24, 2024
8 8 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 10/24 11:13 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Rheta Negrete-Neal.(cdi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 E-mail to Intake box
Friday, October 04, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 10/04 2:49 PM
SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING SERVICE OF PROCESS. Show Cause Response due by 10/25/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on 10/04/2024. (jad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 08/27 5:13 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 09/24/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on 08/27/2024. (jad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
5 5 notice ADR Compliance Wed 05/01 4:20 PM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (csf)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Wed 05/01 4:20 PM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice LR 16.2 Wed 05/01 4:19 PM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Initiation Fee Received Wed 05/01 4:19 PM
Case initiation fee: PAID $ 405.00, receipt number 200003992 (csf)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Pro Se Complaint Wed 05/01 3:33 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT for a Civil Case against All Defendants, filed by Rheta Negrete-Neal.(csf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case assignment label
misc Clerks Referral to Magistrate Judge Wed 05/01 4:32 PM
Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters. Pursuant to Local Rule 4.1(b)(1), the plaintiff shall present the Clerk with a properly completed summons for each defendant, and the Clerk shall issue the summons(es) to the plaintiff for service on the defendant(s). (csf)
Related: [-]